EP1546151 - ANTIDEPRESSANT CYCLOALKYLAMINE DERIVATIVES OF HETEROCYCLE-FUSED BENZODIOXANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STACK, Gary, Paul 525 Brookfield Lane Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 02 /
EVRARD, Deborah, Ann 12 Cranbrook Road Hamilton Square, NJ 08690 / US | 03 /
SHAH, Uresh, Shantilal 3 Kinglet Drive North Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Wileman, David Francis Dr. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03795686.9 | 11.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US28459 | Priority number, date | US20020410072P | 12.09.2002 Original published format: US 410072 P | US20030659174 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: US 659174 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004024732 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546151 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546151 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/4741, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D498/04 (KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | 02.03.2005 | LT | 02.03.2005 | LV | 02.03.2005 | MK | 02.03.2005 | Title | German: | ANTIDEPRESSIV WIRKENDE CYCLOALKYLAMINDERIVATE VON MIT HETEROCYCLEN KONDENSIERTEN BENZODIOXANEN | [2005/26] | English: | ANTIDEPRESSANT CYCLOALKYLAMINE DERIVATIVES OF HETEROCYCLE-FUSED BENZODIOXANS | [2005/26] | French: | DERIVES CYCLOALKYLAMINE ANTIDEPRESSEURS DE BENZODIOXANES FUSIONNES AU NIVEAU DES HETEROCYCLES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 12.04.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2008/48] | GR | 13.07.2006 | |
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | MC | 30.09.2006 | |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 12.04.2006 | |
MC | 30.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9717343 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [A] 1-34 * Abstract; page 6; claim 1. *; | [A]WO9829415 (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-34 * Abstract; page 23, table 1; claim 1. *; | [A]WO9840386 (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-34 * Abstract; page 13; page 24, table 1; claim 1. *; | [PA]WO02072587 (WYETH CORP [US]) [PA] 1-34 * Abstract; pages 21-22; claim 1. *; | [PA]WO02088135 (WYETH CORP [US]) [PA] 1-34* Abstract; page 15; claim 1. * |