EP1554055 - SPRAY DEVICE ACTUATED BY MOVEMENT BETWEEN A CONTAINER AND A SURROUNDING CASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COTY 14 rue du Quatre Septembre 75002 Paris / FR | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Coty SA 54, rue de Londres 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIEZ, Jean-Louis 36, avenue de la Gare F-91470 Limours / FR | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Schwartz, Thierry J., et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Schwartz, Thierry J., et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03795955.8 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003EP14778 | Priority number, date | FR20020013367 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0213367 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004037435 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554055 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554055 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1554055 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A45D34/02 (EP,US);
B05B11/0038 (EP,US);
B05B11/1052 (EP,US);
B05B11/1074 (EP,US);
B05B11/1077 (EP,US);
A45D2034/005 (EP,US);
A45D2200/057 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG BETÄTIGT DURCH EINE BEWEGUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM BEHÄLTER UND EINER UMGEBENDEN HÜLLE | [2005/29] | English: | SPRAY DEVICE ACTUATED BY MOVEMENT BETWEEN A CONTAINER AND A SURROUNDING CASING | [2005/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE ENTRAINEMENT ET TETE PIVOTANTE SOUPLE POUR UN FLACON PULVERISATEUR | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 09.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | CZ | 23.08.2006 | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | RO | 23.08.2006 | SI | 23.08.2006 | SK | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | LU | 17.09.2006 | IE | 18.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | PT | 25.01.2007 | HU | 24.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
LU | 17.09.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10179739 ; | [A]US4771769 (HEGEMANN MANFRED K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9405593 (DONNA KARAN BEAUTY COMPANY [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 27, line 19 - page 29, line 28; compounds 20,21 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10179739 A 19980707 (TAISEI KAKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |