EP1590833 - INTEGRATION CAPACITOR USING A PHOTODETECTOR AS THE BOTTOM PLATE OF THE CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUESCHER, Kevin Scott 5675 Flag Way Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Vigand, Philippe, et al ICB, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 03796104.2 | 16.12.2003 | [2005/44] | WO2003EP51023 | Priority number, date | US20030353060 | 29.01.2003 Original published format: US 353060 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068583 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590833 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590833 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H04N3/15, H04N5/217 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/20] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRATIONSKONDENSATOR, WELCHER EINEN PHOTODETEKTOR ALS UNTERE KONDENSATORELEKTRODE VERWENDET | [2005/44] | English: | INTEGRATION CAPACITOR USING A PHOTODETECTOR AS THE BOTTOM PLATE OF THE CAPACITOR | [2005/44] | French: | CONDENSATEUR D'INTEGRATION UTILISANT UN PHOTODETECTEUR COMME PLAQUE INFERIEURE DU CONDENSATEUR | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.08.2006 | [2007/41] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5233180 (TSURUTA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0055919 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 25 * * page 9, line 26 - line 30; figure 5 *; | [A]WO0247255 (PIXEL DEVICES INTERNATIONAL IN [US]) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [A] - MATHERSON K J ET AL, "Progress in the development of large-area modular 64/spl times/64 CdZnTe imaging arrays for nuclear medicine", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM, 1997. IEEE ALBUQUERQUE, NM, USA 9-15 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971109), ISBN 0-7803-4258-5, pages 276 - 280, XP010275807 [A] 1-17 * page 278; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.1997.672584 |