EP1558748 - CELL LYSIS COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF USE, APPARATUS, AND KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMEGA CORPORATION 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Laurie 701 Constitution Lane DeForest, WI 53532 / US | 02 /
SHULTZ, John, W. 407 Melody Lane Verona, WI 53593 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Tonny, M. 3316 Country Grove Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | 04 /
ZIMMERMAN, Kristopher 4362 De Volis Parkway Madison, WI 53711 / US | 05 /
BOZEK, Laura, L. 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 06 /
STEVENS, Judith, N. 670 Highway MM Oregon, WI 53575 / US | [2007/13] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
ENGEL, Laurie 701 Constitution Lane DeForest, WI 53532 / US | ||
02 /
SHULTZ, John, W. 407 Melody Lane Verona, WI 53593 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Tonny, M. 3316 Country Grove Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
04 /
ZIMMERMAN, Kristopher 507 Whispering Pines Way Madison, WI 53713 / US | |||
05 /
BOZEK, Laura, L. 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
06 /
STEVENS, Judith, N. 670 Highway MM Oregon, WI 53575 / US | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/31] | Webber, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03796345.1 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US30463 | Priority number, date | US20020422931P | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 422931 P | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004042003 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558748 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06, C07H19/00, C07H21/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B01D15/3804 (EP,US);
B01D15/361 (EP,US);
B01J20/28009 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
C11D1/44 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/88 (EP,US);
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLYSEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND KIT | [2005/31] | English: | CELL LYSIS COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF USE, APPARATUS, AND KIT | [2005/31] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE LYSE CELLULAIRE, LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION, APPAREIL ET TROUSSE ASSOCIES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0222725 (LABOFINA SA [BE]) [Y] 1-13,15,17-22,28-32 * tables 7,8 *; | [X]WO9827230 (MAXYGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * pages 78-79 *; | [Y] - HANCOCK R E W, "ALTERATIONS IN OUTER MEMBRANE PERMEABILITY", ORNSTON, L. N. (ED.). ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY, VOL. 38. XLIV+613P. ANNUAL REVIEWS INC.: PALO ALTO, CALIF., USA. ILLUS SERIES : ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY (ISSN 0066-4227), (1984), ISSN 0-8243-1138-8, pages 237 - 264, XP002495217 [Y] 1-13,15,17-22,28-32 * page 252 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.mi.38.100184.001321 | [X] - SCHUPP J.M. ET AL., "Rapid Bacterial Permeabilization Reagent Useful for Enzyme Assays", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1995), vol. 19, no. 1, page 18-20, XP009105458 [X] 1 * page 18, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST * | [X] - THOMSEN L E ET AL, "Protein-ligand interaction: grafting of the uridine-specific determinants from the CytR regulator of Salmonella typhimurium to Escherichia coli CytR", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19990423), vol. 288, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 165 - 175, XP004462254 [X] 1 * page 173, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.2668 | [X] - BURSHTYN D N ET AL, "High occupancy binding of antigenic peptides to purified, immunoadsorbed H-2Db beta 2m molecules.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 SEP 1993, (19930915), vol. 151, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3070 - 3081, XP002495023 [X] 1 * page 3071, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST * | [X] - BROCKS B ET AL, "A TNF receptor antagonistic scFv, which is not secreted in mammalian cells, is expressed as a soluble mono- and bivalent scFv derivative in insect cells", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19971001), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 173 - 184, XP004097001 [X] 1 * page 176, column LEFT, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(97)00011-0 | International search | [Y]US5593866 (HANCOCK ROBERT E W [CA], et al); | [A]US5489676 (ELSBACH PETER [US], et al); | [Y]US5760189 (VICIK STEVEN M [US], et al); | [Y] - HANCOCK R.E.W., ANN. REV. MICROBIOL., (1984), vol. 38, pages 237 - 264, XP002495217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.mi.38.100184.001321 | [Y] - BERG ET AL, CAN J MICROBIOL, (197503), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 386 - 391, XP009105475 | [Y] - LIN ET AL, "Stability of a melittin pore in a lipid bilayer: a molecular dynamics study", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (200004), vol. 78, pages 1714 - 1724, XP002977876 |