EP1593198 - EXPLOITING SHORTEST PATH FOR IMPROVED NETWORK CLOCK DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirrus Logic, Inc. 2901 Via Fortuna Austin, TX 78746 / US | [2005/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Kevin, Paul 2145 Mapleton Avenue Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03796744.5 | 25.11.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003US38821 | Priority number, date | US20020310554 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: US 310554 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004051874 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593198 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03D3/24 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
H04L69/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZUNG DES KÜRZESTEN PFADES FÜR VERBESSERTE TAKTVERTEILUNG IN EINEM NETZ | [2005/45] | English: | EXPLOITING SHORTEST PATH FOR IMPROVED NETWORK CLOCK DISTRIBUTION | [2005/45] | French: | EXPLOITATION DU TRAJET LE PLUS COURT POUR UNE DISTRIBUTION AMELIOREE DES SIGNAUX D'HORLOGE DANS UN RESEAU | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5796787 (CHEN WEIZHONG [US], et al); | [X]US6389090 (ZORTEA ANTHONY E [US], et al) |