EP1578499 - MODULAR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. MS LC340, 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHLSTRAND, Carl, D. 685 Lake Pine Drive Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 02 /
SINGHAL, Ruchika 17 South 1st Street, Apt. A 1005 Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | 03 /
SKIME, Robert, M. 2357 132nd Avenue Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
WAHLSTRAND, Carl, D. 685 Lake Pine Drive Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | ||
02 /
SINGHAL, Ruchika 3513 Dupont Avenue South Number 210 Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | |||
03 /
SKIME, Robert, M. 2357 132nd Avenue Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Hilleringmann, Jochen Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03796800.5 | 09.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003US38981 | Priority number, date | US20020431854P | 09.12.2002 Original published format: US 431854 P | US20030471262P | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 471262 P | US20030503945P | 20.09.2003 Original published format: US 503945 P | US20030503946P | 20.09.2003 Original published format: US 503946 P | US20030507857P | 01.10.2003 Original published format: US 507857 P | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004052458 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578499 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/375, A61N1/36 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61N1/3605 (EP,US);
A61N1/37514 (EP,US);
A61N1/37518 (EP,US);
A61N1/3754 (EP,US);
A61N1/3758 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2005/39] | English: | MODULAR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2005/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE MODULAIRE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6016449 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 11, line 9 - column 13, line 65 * * column 29, lines 14-56; figures 1,2,15-25 *; | [XA]US6269266 (LEYSIEFFER HANS [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,15,21,23 * column 7, line 9 - column 11, line 20; figures 1-8 * [A] 2,6-8,14,16-20,22; | [XA]US6308101 (FALTYS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,19-21,23 * column 9, line 7 - column 14, line 19 * * column 18, line 14 - column 19, line 61; figures 1D-F,3A-B,4A-B,6,7,9A-B,10A-B * [A] 2,6-8,14-18,22; | [XA]US6358281 (BERRANG PETER G [CA], et al) [X] 1-13,17-21,23 * column 2, line 28 - column 14, line 53; figures 1-6,15-18 * [A] 14-16,22; | [A]US6480743 (KIRKPATRICK BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-23* column 7, line 41 - column 15, line 11; figures 1-4 * |