EP1539622 - SWITCH, ESPECIALLY FOR BRANCHING OFF BULK MATERIAL FLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeppelin Silos & Systems GmbH Leutholdstrasse 108 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2006/22] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Zeppelin Silo- und Apparatetechnik GmbH Leutholdstrasse 108 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Robert Am Wattenberg 12a 88718 Daisendorf / DE | 02 /
VOGELSANG, Franz-Josef Ernst-Kretschmer-Strasse 39 88214 Ravensburg / DE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Roth, Klaus, et al Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Roth, Klaus, et al Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Roth, Klaus, et al Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler, Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Roth, Klaus, Dr. Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler, Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797162.9 | 02.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003DE02605 | Priority number, date | DE2002142499 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10242499 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026740 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539622 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539622 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/56 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
B65G53/56 (EP,US);
F16K11/0853 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86871 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [2006/01] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHE, INSBESONDERE ZUM VERZWEIGEN VON SCHÜTTGUTSTRÖMEN | [2005/24] | English: | SWITCH, ESPECIALLY FOR BRANCHING OFF BULK MATERIAL FLOWS | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BIFURCATION, SERVANT NOTAMMENT A FAIRE BIFURQUER DES FLUX DE MATIERES EN VRAC | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 19.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 07.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE19952435 (COPERION WAESCHLE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 30 - line 49 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-10; | [YA]DE968047 (ERFT BERGBAU GES MIT BESCHRAEN) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 69 - page 3, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-10; | [A]GB2198500 (HEAT TRANSFER TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 4 - line 10 * * page 5, line 1 - line 9 * * page 6, line 1 - line 25 * * page 7, line 16 - line 19 * * page 8, line 20 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3007286 (RAPPOLD & CO GMBH HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19702215 (BUEHLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - line 37 * * page 5, line 66 - page 6, line 12 * * figures 5-8 *; | [A]EP1236664 (COPERION WAESCHLE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] * * figures 1,4,5 * |