EP1540858 - METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF POLARISATION MULTIPLEXED OPTICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF OPTICAL POLARIZATION MULTIPLEX SIGNALS | ||
[2007/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Correction of patent specification | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKER, Nancy Technikerstrasse, 38 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
SPINNLER, Bernhard Münchner Str. 23b 82041 München / DE | 03 /
SEBALD, Georg Mäuselweg 19 81375 München / DE | 04 /
CALABRO, Stefano Stiftsbogen 146 81375 München / DE | 05 /
GOTTWALD, Erich Josef-Kammerloher-Str. 18 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
HECKER, Nancy Freibadstr. 15 EG 81543 München / DE | ||
02 /
SPINNLER, Bernhard Boschetsrieder Str. 83 81379 München / DE | |||
03 /
SEBALD, Georg Mäuselweg 19 81375 München / DE | |||
04 /
CALABRO, Stefano Stiftsbogen 146 81375 München / DE | |||
05 /
GOTTWALD, Erich Josef-Kammerloher-Str. 18 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797242.9 | 13.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP08997 | Priority number, date | DE2002143141 | 17.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243141 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028046 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540858 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540858 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1540858 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/148, H04J14/06 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04J14/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/01] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BERTRAGUNG VON OPTISCHEN POLARISATIONSMULTIPL EXSIGNALEN | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF POLARISATION MULTIPLEXED OPTICAL SIGNALS | [2007/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX OPTIQUES MULTIPLEXÉS EN POLARISATION | [2007/48] |
Former [2005/24] | METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF OPTICAL POLARIZATION MULTIPLEX SIGNALS | ||
Former [2005/24] | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX MULTIPLEX DE POLARISATION OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 29.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5008958 (CIMINI JR LEONARD J [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 3A *; | [X]EP0445943 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 48 - line 50 * * page 6, line 4 - line 23 * * page 6, column 34 - page 7, column 16 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0564167 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 19 - line 31 * * column 4, line 16 - line 21 * * column 4, line 56 - line 58 * * column 7, line 14 - line 17 * * column 8, line 24 - line 37 * * figures 1,6 * * column 3, line 54 - line 56 * |