EP1543498 - A METHOD OF SYNTHESIZING OF AN UNVOICED SPEECH SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIGI, Ercan, F. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03797402.9 | 08.08.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003IB03544 | Priority number, date | EP20020078853 | 17.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02078853 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004027754 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543498 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1543498 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/06 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
G10L13/07 (EP,US);
G10L13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SYNTHETISIEREN EINES NICHT STIMMHAFTEN SPRACHSIGNALS | [2005/25] | English: | A METHOD OF SYNTHESIZING OF AN UNVOICED SPEECH SIGNAL | [2005/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'UN SIGNAL VOCAL NON VOISE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | CY | 31.05.2006 | CZ | 31.05.2006 | EE | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | IT | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | RO | 31.05.2006 | SI | 31.05.2006 | SK | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | IE | 08.08.2006 | LU | 08.08.2006 | BG | 31.08.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | HU | 01.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
TR | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
LU | 08.08.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6208960 (GIGI ERCAN F [NL]) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 13 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 2 * * column 9, line 20 - line 35 *; | [AD] - MOULINES E ET AL, "PITCH-SYNCHRONOUS WAVEFORM PROCESSING TECHNIQUES FOR TEXT-TO-SPEECH SYNTHESIS USING DIPHONES", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19901201), vol. 9, no. 5 / 6, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 453 - 467, XP000202900 [AD] 1,8-10 * abstract * * page 455, paragraph 1.2 * * page 456, paragraph 1.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(90)90021-Z | [A] - MICHAEL W MACON-MARK A CLEMENTS, "AN ENHANCED ABS/OLA SINUSOIDAL MODEL FOR WAVEFORM SYNTHESIS IN TTS", PROCEEDINGS EUROSPEECH'99, Berlin, Germany, vol. 5, pages 2327 - 2330, XP007001482 [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * page 2328, paragraph 2.1 * |