EP1542685 - TRIAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR (TGF) INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMBERG, Laura Cook 5 Division Street, Waterford Connecticut 06385 / US | 02 /
MUNCHHOF, Michael John 266 West Road, Salem Connecticut 06420 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer Limited Patents Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/21] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer Limited European Pharma Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Tesch, Rudolf, Dr., et al c/o Pfizer GmbH, Arzneimittelwerk Gödecke Mooswaldallee 1 79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797428.4 | 08.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003IB03825 | Priority number, date | US20020412079P | 18.09.2002 Original published format: US 412079 P | US20030484535P | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 484535 P | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026307 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542685 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/444, C07D471/04, C07D401/14, A61P35/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D413/14 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | 18.04.2005 | LT | 18.04.2005 | LV | 18.04.2005 | MK | 18.04.2005 | Title | German: | NEUE TRIAZOL- UND OXAZOLVERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN DES TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTORS (TGF) | [2005/25] | English: | TRIAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR (TGF) INHIBITORS | [2005/25] | French: | DERIVES DE TRIAZOLE SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE TRANSFORMANT (TGF) | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6058981 ; | [X]JP2000302680 ; | [X]EP0149884 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * page 1, 1st paragraph; Caplus RN: 97422-31-6, 97422-41-8, 97422-42-9, 97422-43-0 *; | [X]WO9315071 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM INTERCREDIT [NL]) [X] 1,11 * Caplus-RN:151103-24-1, 1511-0-25-2, 151103-28-5, 151103-21-8, 151103-22-9, 151103-26-3, 151103-27-4, 151103-29-6, 151103-30-9, 151103-31-0, 151103-33-2, 151103-35-4; page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 7 *; | [X]EP1205478 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * Caplus-RN: 97422-31-6,97422-41-8,97422-42-9, 97422-43-0, 223914-58-7; page 2, line 5 - page 2, line 9 *; | [X]WO02051442 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,11* Caplus-RN: 97422-31-6, 97422-41-8, 97422-42-9, 97422-43-0, 223914-58-7 *; | [X]WO02062753 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * assays 1,2; page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 6; examples 1-6; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO02062793 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 6; examples 1-3; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO02062776 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 6; examples 1-3; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO02062775 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract; Caplus-RN: 446066-02-0, 446065-54-9 *; | [X]US6436966 (OHKAWA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * Caplus-RN:97422-31-6, 97422-41-8, 97422-42-9, 97422-43-0, 223914-58-7; column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 11; example - *; | [PX]WO02100433 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850803), vol. 009, no. 188, Database accession no. (C - 295), & JP60058981 A 19850405 (TAKEDA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000302680 A 20001031 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,11 * abstract * |