EP1551066 - MATERIAL WITH PATTERN SURFACE FOR USE AS TEMPLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Masamichi 1-12-11 Tsutsujigaoka-kita Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1348 / JP | 02 /
Otsuka, Hideyuki 3-3-3-403 Hakomatsu, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0061 / JP | 03 /
Takahara, Atsushi 5-19-8 Nanakuma, Jonan-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-0133 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Ikuo, Yodogawa Works of DAIKIN IND. LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 05 /
Itami, Yasuo, Yodogawa Works of DAIKIN IND. LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 06 /
Aoyama, Hirokazu, Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. LTD., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797648.7 | 18.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003JP11876 | Priority number, date | JP20020273144 | 19.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002273144 | [2005/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004027889 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551066 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/075 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H10K71/191 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL MIT STRUKTUROBERFLÄCHE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS VORLAGE UND PROZESS SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2005/27] | English: | MATERIAL WITH PATTERN SURFACE FOR USE AS TEMPLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/27] | French: | MATERIAU A SURFACE DE STRUCTURE EN TANT QUE GABARIT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | Translation filed | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002081520 (SOORIYAKUMARAN RATNAM [US], et al) [Y] 1,9,10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2002261048 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-14 * see passages of US-Doc *; | US2003024103 [ ] (KIGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0046] , [0050] *; | [Y] - SUGIMURA H ET AL, "MICROPATTERNING OF ALKYL-AND FLUOROALKYLSILANE SELF-ASSEMBLED MONOLAYERS USING VACUUM ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000208), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 885 - 888, XP000929923 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la990953e | [Y] - JEON N L ET AL, "PATTERNED SELF-ASSEMBLED MONOLAYERS FORMED BY MICROCONTACT PRINTING DIRECT SELECTIVE METALIZATION BY CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION ON PLANAR AND NONPLANAR SUBSTRATES", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19950808), vol. 11, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 3024 - 3026, XP001088596 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la00008a029 | [Y] - NOO LI JEON ET AL, "A MONOLAYER-BASED LIFT-OFF PROCESS FOR PATTERNING CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION COPPER THIN FILMS", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19961030), vol. 12, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 5350 - 5355, XP001088595 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la960377b | [Y] - RIEKE P C ET AL, "SPATIALLY RESOLVED MINERAL DEPOSITION ON PATTERNED SELF-ASSEMBLED MONOLAYERS", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19940101), vol. 10, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 619 - 622, XP009071465 [Y] 1-14 * page 620, column 2, line 15 - line 22 * * page 619, column 2, line 12 - line 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la00015a003 | [A] - HOFFMANN P W ET AL, "Vapor phase self-assembly of fluorinated monolayers on silicon and germanium oxide", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970101), vol. 13, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 1877 - 1880, XP002272050 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la961091+ | [A] - ST JOHN P M ET AL, "MONOLAYERS OF FLUORINATED SILANES AS ELECTRON-BEAM RESISTS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 69 - 74, XP000558383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.588436 | [A] - "Low temperature deposition of patterned TiO2 thin films using photopatterned self-assembled monolayers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, (19960805), vol. 69, no. 6, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 860 - 862, XP012017157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.117916 | International search | [X]EP1041652 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]JP2001284289 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2001284288 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2001284274 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2002023356 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2002261048 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2002311592 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2003162058 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |