EP1551116 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Teruya, SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03797710.5 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003JP12023 | Priority number, date | JP20020274978 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002274978 | [2005/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028040 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551116 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04B7/08 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H04B7/0814 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/02] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2005/27] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2005/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2005 | Translation filed | 04.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 05.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0797369 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-21 * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 57; figures 2, 4 * * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 37; figures 7,8; claim 1 ** column 10, line 30 - line 31 *; | [X]JP2000232458 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0051] *; | [X]JP2000232456 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2000232458 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2000232456 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) |