EP1539002 - SUTURELESS RETENTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interrad Medical, Inc. 6519 Cecelia Circle Minneapolis, MN 55439 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Michael, S. 4187 Amberleaf Trail Eagan, MN 55123 / US | 02 /
CLAUDE, Timothy, J. 1228 97th Avenue Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Hillier, Peter Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03797790.7 | 14.05.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US15144 | Priority number, date | US20020412453P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412453 P | US20030383903 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: US 383903 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026152 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539002 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539002 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61M5/32, A61M25/04 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3484 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0293 (EP,US);
A61M25/0084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | A61B17/32, A61M5/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHTLOSE HALTEVORRICHTUNG | [2005/24] | English: | SUTURELESS RETENTION DEVICE | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENTION SANS SUTURE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | IE | 14.05.2010 | LU | 14.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
LU | 14.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
LU | 14.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 16.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5267960 (HAYMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US5769821 (ABRAHAMSON TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9* column 8, lines 30-43; figures 2a,2b *; | [X]US2002120250 (ALTMAN PETER A [US]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figures 8a-8c * | International search | [A]US5741234 (ABOUL-HOSN WALID NAGIB [US]) |