EP1539819 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO GENERATE AND CONTROL THE EFFECTOR PROFILE OF T CELLS BY SIMULTANEOUS LOADING AND ACTIVATION OF SELECTED SUBSETS OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multicell Immunotherapeutics, Inc. 9710 Scranton Road, Suite 170 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Astral, Inc. 6175 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOT, Adrian 24406 West Gable Ranch Lane Valencia, CA 91354 / US | 02 /
WANG, Lilin 12665 Camino Mira Del Mar Rd, 207 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Dan 4004 Caminito Meliado San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
PHILLIPS, Bill 11005 Morning Creek Drive, South San Diego, CA 92128 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
BOT, Adrian 27003 Carmelita Dr. Valencia, CA 91355 / US | ||
02 /
WANG, Lilin 12665 Camino Mira Del Mar Rd, 207 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Dan 4004 Caminito Meliado San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
PHILLIPS, Bill 11005 Morning Creek Drive, South San Diego, CA 92128 / US | Representative(s) | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03797931.7 | 18.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US30188 | Priority number, date | US20020412219P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412219 P | WO2003US07995 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: PCT/US0307/995 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004027049 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539819 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539819 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/145, A61K39/385, A61K39/39 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/001106 (EP,US);
A61K39/001156 (EP,US);
A61K39/00117 (EP,US);
A61K39/001182 (EP,US);
A61K39/001191 (EP,US);
A61K39/001192 (EP,US);
A61K39/001193 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6056 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20034 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16034 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/12, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | C07K16/00, C12P21/08, C12N5/10, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND STEUERUNG DES EFFEKTORPROFILS VON T-ZELLEN DURCH GLEICHZEITIGES BELADEN UND AKTIVIEREN AUSGEWÄHLTER UNTERGRUPPEN VON ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIERENDEN ZELLEN | [2009/42] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO GENERATE AND CONTROL THE EFFECTOR PROFILE OF T CELLS BY SIMULTANEOUS LOADING AND ACTIVATION OF SELECTED SUBSETS OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR GENERER ET CONTROLER LE PROFIL EFFECTEUR DE LYMPHOCYTES T PAR LE CHARGEMENT ET L'ACTIVATION DE SOUS-ENSEMBLES SELECTIONNES DE CELLULES PRESENTANT L'ANTIGENE | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/24] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERSTELLUNG UND STEUERUNG DES EFFEKTORPROFILS VON T-ZELLEN DURCH GLEICHZEITIGES BELADEN UND AKTIVIEREN AUSGEWÄHLTER UNTERGRUPPEN VON ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIERENDEN ZELLEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 02.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2007 | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | LU | 18.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
LU | 18.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9622377 (ARMITAGE IAN M [GB], et al); | [A]WO9954484 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]WO0136641 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO0193902 (BIOSYNEXUS INC [US]) | International search | [Y]WO9619584 (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]); | [Y]US5663153 (HUTCHERSON STEPHEN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5958457 (SANTIAGO NOEMI B [US], et al); | [Y]US5969109 (BONA CONSTANTIN [US], et al); | Examination | WO03078595 |