EP1542836 - TOOL HOLDING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70422 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAUHAMMER, Karl Klingenstr. 24 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
SCHNERRING, Heinz Lindenstr. 20 72135 Dettenhausen / DE | 03 /
FRIEDRICH, Joerg Free Trade Zone Phase 1 MY-1190 Penang / MY | 04 /
STRASSER, Andreas Hegelstr. 6 73635 Rudersberg / DE | [2005/25] | Application number, filing date | 03798040.6 | 04.06.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003DE01851 | Priority number, date | DE2002143289 | 18.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243289 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028752 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542836 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542836 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/08 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B25D17/088 (EP);
B25D2216/0069 (EP);
B25D2217/0049 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2006/02] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGAUFNAHME | [2005/25] | English: | TOOL HOLDING FIXTURE | [2005/25] | French: | RACCORDEMENT D'OUTIL | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3421811 (HILTI AG) [X] 1-7,11,12 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 4 *; | [A]US4898250 (PLANK UTO ET AL) [A] 1,8,10 * column 5, line 27 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3638215 (HILTI AG) |