EP1540821 - CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION FOR AVERAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Bernd Entenweg 5 92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | 02 /
VÖLKL, Peter Roither Weg 2 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 03798049.7 | 31.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003DE02580 | Priority number, date | DE2002143564 | 19.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243564 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004030211 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540821 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540821 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/19, H03K5/08, G01D1/02 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01D1/02 (EP,US);
H03K5/19 (KR);
H03K5/08 (KR);
H03K5/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR MITTELWERTBILDUNG | [2005/24] | English: | CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION FOR AVERAGING | [2005/24] | French: | CIRCUIT POUR ETABLIR DES MOYENNES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 15.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04144423 ; | [X]EP0367522 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 33; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5142286 (RIBNER DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 65 - column 12, line 29; figures 2,3A *; | [X]US5329281 (BAUMGARTNER RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 12, line 59 - column 14, line 32; figure 7 *; | [X]EP0804038 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 11, line 52 - column 13, line 48; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920904), vol. 016, no. 420, Database accession no. (E - 1259), & JP04144423 A 19920518 (JEOL LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |