EP1557165 - COMBINATION DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [2007/15] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Nobuyuki 3-406, Este Square, 39-1, Tagu 2-chome Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1237 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI, Kazuto 3-304, Park Hill Azuma, 19-1, Azuma 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0031 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03798438.2 | 22.09.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003JP12075 | Priority number, date | JP20020280137 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002280137 | JP20030117927 | 23.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003117927 | [2005/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028524 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557165 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K45/00, A61K31/496, A61K31/5025, A61K31/522, A61P1/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P5/00, A61P5/50, A61P43/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5025 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5025, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | 26.04.2005 | LT | 26.04.2005 | LV | 26.04.2005 | MK | 26.04.2005 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSARZNEIMITTEL | [2005/30] | English: | COMBINATION DRUG | [2005/30] | French: | MEDICAMENT COMBINE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2005 | Translation filed | 26.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 10.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP1338595 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1 * claim - *; | [Y] - BAILEY C J, "Potential new treatments for type 2 diabetes", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARTH, GB, (20000701), vol. 21, no. 7, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 259 - 265, XP004209787 [Y] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(00)01506-6 | [A] - AUGUSTYNS K ET AL, "THE UNIQUE PROPERTIES OF DIPEPTIDYL-PEPTIDASE IV (DPP IV/CD26) AND THE THERAPEUTIC POTENTIAL OF DPP IV INHIBITORS", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, BE, (19990101), vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 0929-8673, pages 311 - 327, XP000870290 | International search | [X]WO0152825 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO0197808 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al); | [X]WO0202560 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [X]WO02068420 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al); | [XP]WO03004496 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [X] - HINKE S.A., "Metformin effects on dipeptidylpeptidase IV degradation of glucagon-like peptide-1", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (20020315), vol. 291, no. 5, pages 1302 - 1308, XP002976338 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2002.6607 | [X] - HINKE S.A., "On combination therapy of diabetes with metformin and dipeptidyl peptidase IV inhibitors", DIABETES CARE, (200208), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 1490 - 1491, XP002976339 | [XP] - YASUDA N., "Enhanced secretion of glucagon-like peptide 1 by biguanide compounds", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (20021115), vol. 298, no. 5, pages 779 - 784, XP002976340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02565-2 |