EP1542551 - PROCESS FOR RETAINING MOISTURE IN COOKED FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/25] | FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR RETAINING MOISTURE IN COOKED FOOD | ||
[2010/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proteus Industries, Inc. 21 great Republic Drive Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2011/24] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Proteus Industries, Inc. 21 great Republic Drive Gloucester, MA 01930 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLEHER, Stephen, D. 3 Blaisdell Terrace Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Peter, G. 112R Thatcher Road Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/25] | 01 /
KELLEHER, Stephen, D. 178 Main Street Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | ||
02 /
WILLIAMSON, Peter, G. 112R Thatcher Road Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03798665.0 | 01.07.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US20898 | Priority number, date | US20020252873 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: US 252873 | US20030378139 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: US 378139 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028280 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542551 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542551 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/314, A23L1/317, A23L1/318 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A23L13/424 (EP);
A23L13/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/24] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 23.03.2005 | LT | 23.03.2005 | LV | 23.03.2005 | MK | 23.03.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKHALTUNG VON FEUCHTIGKEIT IN GEGARTEN NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2010/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR RETAINING MOISTURE IN COOKED FOOD | [2010/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE RETENTION DE L'HUMIDITE DANS DES ALIMENTS CUITS | [2010/52] |
Former [2005/25] | NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKHALTUNG VON FEUCHTIGKEIT IN GEGARTEN NAHRUNGSMITTELN | ||
Former [2005/25] | FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR RETAINING MOISTURE IN COOKED FOOD | ||
Former [2005/25] | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE ET PROCEDE DE RETENTION DE L'HUMIDITE DANS DES ALIMENTS CUITS | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | IE | 01.07.2011 | LU | 01.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4402987 (VON LERSNER WOLF A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1 * * column 4 * * claim 11 *; | [Y]WO9911656 (ADVANCED PROTEIN TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,27,28 * * page 5, lines 15-22 * * pages 8,9 * * page 11, lines 7-9,11-13, 24-25, 26-17 * * page 1 * * page 16, lines 1-3 ** page 15, line 23 * | International search | [Y]US4402987 ; | [Y]US6005073 ; | [Y]US4210677 ; | [Y]US4741906 ; | [A]US6136959 |