EP1549394 - CARDIOVASCULAR ANCHORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/27] | CARDIOVASCULAR ANCHORING DEVICE AND METHOD OF DEPLOYING SAME | ||
[2011/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91342 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Savacor, Inc. 10780 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste. 401 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARDLE, John, L. 1603 Via Ameno San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | 02 /
EIGLER, Neal, L. 459 Surfview Drive Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03798764.1 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US30525 | Priority number, date | US20020413758P | 26.09.2002 Original published format: US 413758 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004028348 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549394 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549394 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/37, A61B5/07 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/0215 (EP,US);
A61B5/6882 (EP,US);
A61N1/057 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B5/145 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | A61N1/37 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | KARDIOVASKULÄRE VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/15] | English: | CARDIOVASCULAR ANCHORING DEVICE | [2011/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE CARDIO-VASCULAIRE | [2011/15] |
Former [2005/27] | KARDIOVASKULûRE VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ABLAGEVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2005/27] | CARDIOVASCULAR ANCHORING DEVICE AND METHOD OF DEPLOYING SAME | ||
Former [2005/27] | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE CARDIO-VASCULAIRE ET PROCEDE DE DEPLOIEMENT DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2003 | AT | 07.12.2011 | BE | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 07.12.2011 | |
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3397699 (KOHL GERALD C) [A] 1,3,6,10,11 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 48; figure - *; | [A]US5755767 (DOAN PHONG D [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6,10,11,15 * column 6, line 24 - line 48 ** column 7, line 5 - line 32; figures 6-8 *; | [X]US2002077555 (SCHWARTZ YITZHACK [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,11,15-17 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0071] - [0073] - [0097] , [0100] - [0102] - [0109] , [0118]; figure -; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US3397699 (KOHL GERALD C); | [A]US4899751 (COHEN TODD [US]); | [X]US6178349 (KIEVAL ROBERT S [US]) | by applicant | US3397699 | US5755767 | US6328699 | US2002077555 |