EP1551080 - ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Noriharu 1-9-14-208, Saido, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233-0008 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Hideki 1-9-202, Nakaze, Samukawa-machi Koza-gun, Kanagawa 253-0112 / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799089.2 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003JP10973 | Priority number, date | JP20020293822 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002293822 | [2005/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004032283 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551080 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/28, H04B7/06, H04B1/00 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04B7/12 (EP,US);
H01Q1/241 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | H01Q21/30, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENEINRICHTUNG | [2005/27] | English: | ANTENNA DEVICE | [2005/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2005 | Translation filed | 07.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 26.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/44] | 24.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0751631 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 38 - line 42; figure 1 * * column 7, line 39 - line 44 *; | [A]GB2307831 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 20, line 4 - line 7 *; | [Y]US6115585 (MATERO JORMA [FI], et al) [Y] 2,6,9 * figure 9 *; | [A]GB2355155 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1124337 (NOKIA INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]WO0201741 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | EP1303055 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO0150636 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2001244844 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JPS63191733U ; | [A]JP2001036461 (NEC SHIZUOKA LTD) |