EP1546614 - Panel for a gas treatment housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | HOUSING FOR GAS-TREATING COMPONENTS PANEL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A HOUSING | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altena Services B.V. Keurweg 10 5145 NX Waalwijk / NL | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EUWEN, Derk, Bastiaan Perzikstraat 3 NL-4261 KC Wijk en Aalburg / NL | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus, et al Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus, et al Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 03799217.9 | 21.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003NL00593 | Priority number, date | NL20021021570 | 01.10.2002 Original published format: NL 1021570 | [2005/26] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031664 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546614 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546614 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/02 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F24H9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Füllwand für ein Gasbehandlungsgehäuse | [2010/17] | English: | Panel for a gas treatment housing | [2010/15] | French: | Panneau d'un logement pour le traitment de gas | [2010/15] |
Former [2005/26] | GEHÜse FÜR GASBEHANDLUNGSBAUTEILETAFEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN GEHÜSES | ||
Former [2005/26] | HOUSING FOR GAS-TREATING COMPONENTS PANEL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A HOUSING | ||
Former [2005/26] | LOGEMENT POUR COMPOSANTS DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ, PANNEAU ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DUDIT LOGEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2003 | Translation filed | 31.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Observations by third parties | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3148956 (HETHERWICK FREDERIC B, et al) [X] 1,6,12 * column 1, line 57 - column 1, line 65 *; | [X]US4819448 (BARDO CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * column W *; | [X]US5761908 (OAS HEIDI D [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column A *; | [X]US5870868 (KITA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]FR2777494 (KAYSERSBERG PACKAGING SA [FR]) [A] 7,13* abstract * | Examination | GB1472365 | EP0454228 | by applicant | EP0454228 | other | GB1372365 |