EP1572610 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 1.6-HEXANEDIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Rolf-Hartmuth Bergstr. 98 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
KRUG, Thomas Wisserstr. 18 67550 Worms / DE | 03 /
HAUNERT, Andrea Windeckstrasse 103-105 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
RÖPER, Michael Pegauer Str. 10 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 05 /
SIRCH, Tilman Limburgstr. 18 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 06 /
STÜER, Wolfram Nietzsche Str. 16 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03799469.6 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP13634 | Priority number, date | DE2002158316 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258316 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054948 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1572610 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572610 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/17, C07C29/149, C07C31/20, C07C67/347, C07C69/593 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C07C29/177 (EP,US);
C07C29/17 (KR);
C07C29/149 (KR);
C07C31/20 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/177, C07C31/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,6-HEXANDIOL | [2005/37] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 1.6-HEXANEDIOL | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 1,6-HEXANEDIOL | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 03.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | RO | 02.08.2006 | SI | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | AT | 03.12.2006 | LU | 03.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | HU | 03.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
LU | 03.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 02.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DY]JPH06329567 ; | [DY]EP0475386 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [DY] 1,3-6 * examples 7-11,13 *; | [DY]EP0552463 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [DY] 1,3-6 * page 4, line 35 - line 39; claim - *; | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP6329567 A 19941129 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD) [DY] 1,3-6 * abstract * | [Y] - BROOKHART, MAURICE ET AL, "Catalytic tail-to-tail dimerization of methyl acrylate using rhodium(III) catalysts", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 113(7), 2777-9 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1991), XP002278173 [Y] 1,3-6 * page 2778, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00007a076 |