EP1585670 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A HINGED-LID PACKET OF CIGARETTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPATAFORA, Mario Via del Lavoro, 56 I-40100 BOLOGNA / IT | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/42] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03799608.9 | 30.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003EP51116 | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00014 | 14.01.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030014 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063015 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585670 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585670 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22, B31B7/00, B31B3/00, B65D85/10 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
B65D85/10484 (EP,US);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B31B2105/002 (EP,US);
B31B2120/408 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KLAPPDECKELVERPACKUNG FÜR ZIGARETTEN | [2005/42] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A HINGED-LID PACKET OF CIGARETTES | [2005/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PAQUET DE CIGARETTES A COUVERCLE A CHARNIERE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | CZ | 14.06.2006 | EE | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | RO | 14.06.2006 | SI | 14.06.2006 | SK | 14.06.2006 | TR | 14.06.2006 | BG | 14.09.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | HU | 15.12.2006 | LU | 30.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | IE | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
TR | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
HU | 15.12.2006 | ||
LU | 30.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
HU | 15.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
IE | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH405911 (HESSER AG MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 46 - page 2, line 70; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0414532 (TOBACCO RES & DEV [CH]) [A] 1* column 3, line 25 - line 52; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US6015084 (MATHIEU GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 5,6 * figures 29a-29d *; | [A]US6244435 (CHO MYONG HO [KR]) [A] 1-4 * column 10, line 18 - column 12, line 7; figures 8-13,15 * |