EP1585972 - USE OF GENE EXPRESSION MARKERS FOR ASSESSING CARDIAC ALLOGRAFT REJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/42] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSING AND MONITORING TRANSPLANT REJECTION | ||
[2012/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XDx, Inc. 750 Gateway Boulevard Suite H San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Expression Diagnostics, Inc. 750 Gateway Boulevard, Suite H South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOHLGEMUTH, Jay 1165 Monte Rosa Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
FRY, Kirk 2604 Ross Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
WOODWARD, Robert 1828 Rheem Court Pleasanton, CA 94558 / US | 04 /
LY, Ngoc 2000 Crystal Springs Road 15-14 San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | 05 /
PRENTICE, James 1414 Polk Street San Francisco, California 94109 / US | 06 /
MORRIS, MacDonald 34 Lloyden Drive Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 07 /
ROSENBERG, Steven 2323 Bywood Drive Oakland, CA 94682 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03799755.8 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003US12946 | Priority number, date | US20020131831 | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 131831 | US20020325899 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 325899 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004042346 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1585972 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585972 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/564, G01N33/567, G01N33/68 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6888 (EP,US);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/6863 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2800/245 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/567, G01N33/53, G01N24/08, C12P19/34 | ||
Former IPC [2005/42] | G01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON GENEXPRESSIONMARKERN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG VON ALLOGRAFT-ABSTOSSUNG DES HERZENS | [2012/39] | English: | USE OF GENE EXPRESSION MARKERS FOR ASSESSING CARDIAC ALLOGRAFT REJECTION | [2012/39] | French: | UTILISATION DE MARQUEURS GENETIQUES D'EXPRESSION POUR L'EVALUATION DU REJET D'UNE ALLOGREFFE CARDIAQUE | [2012/39] |
Former [2005/42] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON TRANSPLANTATABSTOSSUNG | ||
Former [2005/42] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSING AND MONITORING TRANSPLANT REJECTION | ||
Former [2005/42] | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE SURVEILLER LE REJET D'UN GREFFON | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 21.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08016970.9 / EP2194145 | EP10157687.4 / EP2253719 | EP10183179.0 / EP2292786 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2003 | AT | 20.03.2013 | BE | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | IE | 24.04.2013 | LU | 24.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | SE | 20.03.2013 | |
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.03.2013 | |
BG | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9716568 (BOWIE LEMUEL J [US]) [X] 1-8 * sequences 8-10 * * SEQ ID NO: 86 *; | [X]WO0058473 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * SEQ ID NO: 94 *; | [X]WO0157182 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * sequence 35302 * * SEQ ID NO: 107 *; | [A]WO0181916 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02057414 (BIOCARDIA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * * sequences 873, 1956, 3707, 4281 * * SEQ ID NO: 86, 87, 94, 107 *; | [X] - FINGER L R ET AL, "The human PD-1 gene: complete cDNA, genomic organization, and developmentally regulated expression in B cell progenitors", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970915), vol. 197, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 177 - 187, XP004126417 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00260-6 | [A] - JARDI M ET AL, "UROKINASE RECEPTOR (UPAR) EXPRESSION DURING HEMATOPOIETIC MATURATION", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, DE, (1994), vol. 8, no. SUPPL 1, ISSN 1061-186X, page 51, XP009043992 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - WILLEMS R ET AL, "Decrease in nucleoside diphosphate kinase (NDPK/nm23) expression during hematopoietic maturation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19980529), vol. 273, no. 22, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13663 - 13668, XP002285299 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.22.13663 | [A] - LE NAOUR FRANCOIS ET AL, "Profiling changes in gene expression during differentiation and maturation of monocyte-derived dendritic cells using both oligonucleotide microarrays and proteomics", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20010525), vol. 276, no. 21, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17920 - 17931, XP002236582 [A] * the whole document * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M100156200 | [A] - TAMAYO P ET AL, "INTERPRETING PATTERNS OF GENE EXPRESSION WITH SELF-ORGANIZING MAPS:METHODS AND APPLICATION TO HEMATOPOIETIC DIFFERENTIATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199903), vol. 96, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2907 - 2912, XP000942169 [A] * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.6.2907 | [A] - DIETZ ALLAN B ET AL, "Maturation of human monocyte-derived dendritic cells studied by microarray hybridization", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20000907), vol. 275, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 731 - 738, XP002236579 [A] * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.3372 | [A] - KRAUSE S W ET AL, "Carboxypeptidase M as marker of macrophage maturation", IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, MUNKSGAARD, (1998), vol. 161, ISSN 0105-2896, pages 119 - 127, XP002272949 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-065X.1998.tb01576.x | [A] - GORCZYNSKI R M ET AL, "CORRELATION OF PERIPHERAL BLOOD LYMPHOCYTE AND INTRAGRAFT CYTOKINE MRNA EXPRESSION WITH REJECTION IN ORTHOTOPIC LIVER TRANSPLANTATION", SURGERY, C.V. MOSBY CO., ST. LOUIS,, US, (199609), vol. 120, no. 3, ISSN 0039-6060, pages 496 - 502, XP008005398 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6060(96)80069-9 | [A] - DUGRE F J ET AL, "Cytokine and cytotoxic molecule gene expression determined in peripheral blood mononuclear cells in the diagnosis of acute renal rejection", TRANSPLANTATION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20001015), vol. 70, no. 7, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 1074 - 1080, XP002434104 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-200010150-00014 | [A] - VASCONCELLOS L M ET AL, "CYTOTOXIC LYMPHOCYTE GENE EXPRESSION IN PERIPHERAL BLOOD LEUKOCYTES CORRELATES WITH REJECTING RENAL ALLOGRAFTS", TRANSPLANTATION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19980915), vol. 66, no. 5, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 562 - 566, XP009083920 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-199809150-00002 | [A] - GRIFFITHS G M ET AL, "Granzyme A and perforin as markers for rejection in cardiac transplantation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, DE, (1991), vol. 21, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 687 - 692, XP002092298 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830210322 | [X] - FULLERTON S M ET AL, "Molecular and population genetic analysis of allelic sequence diversity at the human beta-globin locus.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 1 MAR 1994, (19940301), vol. 91, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1805 - 1809, XP002452767 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.5.1805 | [X] - "Homo sapiens cDNA clone:CBMAXF06, 5'end, expressed in human CD34+ hematopoietic stem/progenitor cells.", EMBL, (20001010), Database accession no. AV742425, URL: EBI, XP002452877 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 86 * | [X] - "Human messenger RNA for beta-globin.", EMBL, (19820609), Database accession no. V00497, URL: EBI, XP002452782 [X] 1-8 * SEQ ID NO: 86 * | [X] - JOULIN V ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of the human 2,3-bisphosphoglycerate mutase gene.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 25 OCT 1988, (19881025), vol. 263, no. 30, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15785 - 15790, XP002452768 [X] 1-8 * figure 4 * * SEQ ID NO: 87 * | [X] - "human STS WI-6978.", EMBL, (19950615), Database accession no. G06338, URL: EBI, XP002452784 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 87 * | [X] - "EST381430 MAGE resequences, MAGK Homo sapiens cDNA, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20000608), Database accession no. AW969353, URL: EBI, XP002452785 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 94 * | [X] - "cr36a07.x1 Human bone marrow stromal cells Homo sapiens cDNA clone HBMSC_cr36a07 3', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19990629), Database accession no. AI755145, URL: EBI, XP002452786 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 94 * | [X] - "Homo sapiens cDNA FLJ20347 fis, clone HEP13790.", EMBL, (20000222), Database accession no. AK000354, URL: EBI, XP002452788 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 94 * | [X] - "ze75b07.s1 Soares_fetal_heart_NbHH19W Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:364789 3', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20011201), Database accession no. AA053887, URL: EBI, XP002452789 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * SEQ ID NO: 107 * | [X] - "Human haplotype C3 beta-globin gene, complete cds.", EMBL, (19931205), Database accession no. L26474, URL: EBI, XP002452781 [X] 1-8 *SEQ ID NO: 86 * | [X] - "Human 2,3-bisphosophoglycerate mutase (BPGM) gene, exon 3.", EMBL, (19890706), Database accession no. M23068, URL: EBI, XP002452783 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - EMBL, (20010208), Database accession no. AAC77576, XP002452787 [X] 1-8 * column A * | [X] - EMBL, (20011107), Database accession no. AAK80490, XP002452790 [X] 1-8 * column A * | International search | [A]US5120525 (GOLDENBERG MILTON D [US]) | Examination | - MORGUN A ET AL, "CYTOKINE AND TLRC7 MRNA EXPRESSION DURING ACUTE REJECTION IN CARDIAC ALLOGRAFT RECIPIENTS", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ELSEVIER INC, ORLANDO, FL; US, (20010201), vol. 1/02, no. 33, doi:10.1016/S0041-1345(00)02613-0, ISSN 0041-1345, page 1610/1611, XP001073543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0041-1345(00)02613-0 | - LAGOO ANAND S ET AL, "Semiquantitative measurement of cytokine messenger RNA in endomyocardium and peripheral blood mononuclear cells from human heart transplant recipients", JOURNAL OF HEART AND LUNG TRANSPLANTATION, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, INC., ST LOUIS, MO, US, (19960201), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1053-2498, pages 206 - 217, XP009138751 | by applicant | - NATURE, vol. 406, pages 747 - 752 | - MENDEL ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUG DES, (2000), vol. 15, pages 29 - 41 | - WILSON, CURR MED CHEM, (2000), vol. 7, pages 73 - 98 | - HAMBY; SHOWWALTER, PHARMACOL THER, (1999), vol. 82, pages 169 - 93 | - SHIMAZAWA, CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (1998), vol. 8, pages 451 - 8 |