EP1573220 - Multi-row cam-actuated centrifugal clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/37] | MULTI-ROW CAM-ACTUATED CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH | ||
[2009/30] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drussel Wilfley Design, LLC P.O. Box 2330 Denver, CO 80201 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRUSSEL, Douglas, W. 4105 West Dawson Road Sedalia, CO 80135 / US | 02 /
WILFLEY, George, Michael 13 Lynn Road Englewood, CO 80110 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Lobban, Colin Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Frankland, Nigel Howard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799902.6 | 12.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US39753 | Priority number, date | US20020327160 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 327160 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004061318 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573220 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/12 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
F16D23/12 (EP,US);
F16D43/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/15] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Durch mehrreihige Nocken betätigte Fliehkraftkupplung | [2009/30] | English: | Multi-row cam-actuated centrifugal clutch | [2009/30] | French: | Embrayage centrifuge actionné par came à rangées muliples | [2009/30] |
Former [2005/37] | DURCH MEHRREIHIGE NOCKEN BETÄTIGTE FLIEHKRAFTKUPPLUNG | ||
Former [2005/37] | MULTI-ROW CAM-ACTUATED CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH | ||
Former [2005/37] | EMBRAYAGE CENTRIFUGE ACTIONNE PAR CAME A RANGEES MULIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Observations by third parties | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1922931 (JOSEPH DEFAYS VICTOR JEAN, et al) [A] 1-3,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1080564 (GIBERT) [A] 1,3,4,8-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4550817 (EULER JOHN W [US]); | [A]US5496154 (HALL III ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]US5638935 (FEHRING THOMAS C [US]); | [A]US6533056 (MAIMONE BUD A [US]); | [A]US6705446 (DRUSSEL DOUGLAS W [US], et al) | Examination | US2368299 | US3939734 | US4044371 | US4550817 | by applicant | US2002185355 | other | US3939734 | US4055371 | US6814208 |