EP1584141 - WIRELESS RECEIVER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A REPRESENTATION OF NOISE LEVEL OF A SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Sunnyvale Incorporated 1277 Borregas Avenue, Suite 150 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Sunnyvale Incorporated 1277 Borregas Avenue, Suite 150 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Manoneet 655 S. Fair Oaks Ave., K-301 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
ARIYAVISITAKUL, Sirikiat, L. 875 Mount Katahdin Trail Alpharetta, GA 30022-7104 / US | 03 /
KENDALL, Bruce, R. 881 Pecan Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087-2261 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystrasse 1 85356 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock PL19 9DP / GB | ||
Former [2013/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK91AQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Holt, Michael European Patents Department, Texas Instruments Limited, PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03800103.8 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003US40995 | Priority number, date | US20020326025 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: US 326025 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004057766 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584141 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584141 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7097, H04B7/08, H04L1/06 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/7097 (EP,US);
H04B7/0842 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04B7/0845 (EP,US);
H04B7/0857 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | H04B1/00, H03D1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/51] |
Former [2006/15] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSER EMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER REPRÄSENTATION DES RAUSCHPEGELS EINES SIGNALS | [2005/41] | English: | WIRELESS RECEIVER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A REPRESENTATION OF NOISE LEVEL OF A SIGNAL | [2005/41] | French: | RECEPTEUR SANS FIL ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION D'UNE REPRESENTATION DE NIVEAU DE BRUIT DANS UN SIGNAL | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 26.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2762167 (NORTEL MATRA CELLULAR [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 11 * [Y] 2-4,6-10; | [XY]WO0033504 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 7 * [Y] 2-4,6-10; | [Y]EP1098463 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,6-10* paragraph [0042] *; | [XY]EP1122891 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0034] * [Y] 2-4,6-10; | [XY]WO0178338 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 6 - page 3, line 19 * [Y] 2-4,6-10; | [Y]US6369758 (ZHANG DEMING [CA]) [Y] 2-4,6-10 * column 6, line 41 - line 64 *; | [Y]US2002111142 (KLIMOVITCH GLEB V [US]) [Y] 2-4,6-10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [XY] - BLADSJO D ET AL, "Interference cancellation using antenna diversity for EDGE-enhanced data rates in GSM and TDMA/136", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. VTC 1999 - FALL. IEEE VTS 50TH AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 19-22 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990919), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-5435-7, pages 1956 - 1960, XP010353022 [X] 1,5 * page 1957 * [Y] 2-4,6-10 | International search | [X]US6271781 (PELLON LEOPOLD ERNEST [US]); | [Y]US2004008760 (DOGAN MITHAT C [US]); | [Y]US2002198915 (RAINISH DORON [IL]) | by applicant | EP1122891 |