EP1581923 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING AND REPLYING TO ELECTRONIC MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Building 41 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Google, Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway, Building 41 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Bay-Wei Saint Vicent Lane, 511 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
BUCHHEIT, Paul 1518 Hillview Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
SINGH, Sanjeev Windrest Lane, 13 South San Francisco, CA 94090 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
CHANG, Bay-Wei Saint Vicent Lane, 511 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
BUCHHEIT, Paul High School Way, 920 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
03 /
SINGH, Sanjeev Windrest Lane, 13 South San Francisco, CA 94090 / US | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Hackney, Nigel John Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03800177.2 | 24.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US41276 | Priority number, date | US20020328821 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: US 328821 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059612 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581923 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,KR,US);
H04L51/04 (KR);
G06Q50/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE UND BEANTWORTUNG ELEKTRONISCHER NACHRICHTEN | [2005/40] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING AND REPLYING TO ELECTRONIC MESSAGES | [2005/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR L' AFFICHAGE DE MESSAGES ELECTRONIQUES ET LES REPONSES | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 01.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5764899 (EGGLESTON GENE [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-23,25-30,32,33,35-41,43-48,50,51 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 15 * * column 7, line 59 - column 10, line 34 * [Y] 10,24,31,34,42,49,52; | [XY]WO0180214 (GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11-23,25-30,32,33,35-41,43-48,50,51 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 31 * * page 9, line 3 - line 22 * * page 11, line 6 - page 15, line 31 * * page 19, line 7 - page 21, line 7 * [Y] 10,24,31,34,42,49,52; | [YA]US2001047388 (KONDO HIDEFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 10,24,31,34,42,49,52 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 88 *[A] 1-9,11-23,25-30,32,33,35-41,43-48,50,51; | [XY]US6496853 (KLEIN DEAN A [US]) [X] 1-9,11-23,25-30,32,33,35-41,43-48,50,51 * the whole document * [Y] 10,24,31,34,42,49,52 | International search | [A]US5832171 (HEIST H DANIEL [US]); | [X]US5958006 (EGGLESTON GENE [US], et al); | [A]US6469720 (RINGOT NICOLAS [FR]); | [YP]US6640301 (NG DAVID WAY [US]); | [AE]US6701350 (MITCHELL ANDREW J [US]) |