EP1585406 - MULTI-DIRECTIONAL WIPING ELEMENTS AND DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eegee, LLC 515 Beresford Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAVNEY, James, A., Jr. 725 Wildwood Lane Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
MIX, Jerry 515 Beresford Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
BOYLE, Dennis 1169 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 04 /
SUN, Rickson 2468 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 05 /
LOEW, Christopher 792 E. Charleston Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 06 /
SOBOLL, Pascal, Homero Hainer Weg 3a 63303 Dreieich / DE | 07 /
SUNG-HWE KIM, Daniel 2511 Devri Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
GAVNEY, James, A., Jr. 725 Wildwood Lane Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
02 /
MIX, Jerry 515 Beresford Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | |||
03 /
BOYLE, Dennis 1169 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | |||
04 /
SUN, Rickson 2468 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | |||
05 /
LOEW, Christopher 792 E. Charleston Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
06 /
SOBOLL, Pascal, Homero Flat 1, 95 Beaumont Rd. London, W4 5AJ / GB | |||
07 /
SUNG-HWE KIM, Daniel 2511 Devri Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/29] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/02] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2008/01] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03800263.0 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003US41418 | Priority number, date | US20030439317P | 10.01.2003 Original published format: US 439317 P | US20030454281 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 454281 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004062519 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1585406 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585406 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
A46B9/005 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (US);
A46B9/045 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/10] |
Former [2006/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MULTIDIREKTIONALE WISCHELEMENTE UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2005/42] | English: | MULTI-DIRECTIONAL WIPING ELEMENTS AND DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2005/42] | French: | ELEMENTS D'ESSUYAGE MULTIDIRECTIONNEL ET DISPOSITIF LES UTILISANT | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 03.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9628994 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]GB2371217 (MCDOUGALL GREGORY J [HK]) [A] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [X]US1833555 (BELL JOHN P, et al); | [Y]US4827551 (MASER BRIGITTE [DE], et al); | [X]US6446295 (CALABRESE GIUSEPPE [IT]) | Examination | US2246867 | US3398421 | GB2040161 | EP0195543 | US5584690 | US5604951 | US5729858 | US2001039689 | US6446295 | US2002174499 | US2002189039 | by applicant | US5584960 | US5604951 | US6126533 | US6319332 | US6463619 | US6571417 |