EP1559066 - RFID-UHF INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inside Contactless Bât. 11 A - Parc Club du Golf 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOWALSKI, Jacek Le Rouve, 1095, route de Berre 13090 Aix en Provence / FR | 02 /
SERRA, Didier 55 Redwood Way Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 03 /
CHARRAT, Bruno 2 Lot des Marroniers, 405, avenue des Siffleuses 13090 Aix en Provence / FR | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
KOWALSKI, Jacek Le Rouve, 1095, route de Berre 13090 Aix en Provence / FR | ||
02 /
SERRA, Didier Résidence La Grande Vigne, Bâtiment C 13240 Septeme Les Vallons / FR | |||
03 /
CHARRAT, Bruno 2 Lot des Marroniers, 405, avenue des Siffleuses 13090 Aix en Provence / FR | Representative(s) | Marchand, André Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Marchand, André OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 03807872.1 | 07.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003FR02938 | Priority number, date | FR20020012505 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0212505 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004034317 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1559066 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559066 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G06K19/0724 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE RFID-UHF-SCHALTUNG | [2005/31] | English: | RFID-UHF INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2005/31] | French: | CIRCUIT INTEGRE RFID-UHF | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2009 | CY | 30.12.2009 | CZ | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | EE | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IE | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | RO | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | SI | 30.12.2009 | SK | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | BG | 30.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | ES | 10.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | HU | 01.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5376943 (BLUNDEN PETER P [GB], et al) [A] 1,18* abstract *; | [X]US5453747 (D HONT LOEK [NL], et al) [X] 1,18 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 48; figure 3 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 18 * |