EP1549642 - 6-METHYLPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR PREPARING THEREOF AND ANTIVIRAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/27] | 6-METHYLPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THEREOF AND ANTIVIRAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | ||
[2007/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B & C Biopharm Co., Ltd. 633-2, Goan-ri, Baekam-myeon Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-863 / KR | [2007/33] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states B & C Biopharm Co., Ltd. 633-2, Goan-ri, Baekam-myeon Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-863 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jongwoo 9-908 Samhonewtown Apt.245, Bisan 3dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-050 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sangwook 104-302 Geumho Apt., 149-1, Bakdal 2dong, Manan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 430-030 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Geunhyung 202 ho, 275-6, Gugal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-900 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Jaejin 102-506 Samick Apt. 14, Singal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-900 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Sangjin 557-1, Goan-ri, Baekam-myeon Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-863 / KR | 06 /
PARK, Eulyong 110-504 Hanseong Apt. 380, Gugal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-900 / KR | 07 /
SHIN, Joongchul 557-1, Goan-ri, Baekam-myeon Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-863 / KR | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 03807998.4 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003KR02034 | Priority number, date | KR20020061994 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: KR 20020061994 | [2007/33] |
Former [2005/27] | KR20020061994 | 11.10.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033450 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549642 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549642 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, A61K31/5377, A61P31/12 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | C07D413/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 6-METHYLPYRIDINDERIVAT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND ES ENTHALTENDE ANTIVIRALE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2007/08] | English: | 6-METHYLPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR PREPARING THEREOF AND ANTIVIRAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2007/08] | French: | DERIVE DE 6-METHYLPYRIDINE, PROCEDE D'ELABORATION, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ANTIVIRALE RENFERMANT CE DERIVE | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/27] | 6-METHYLPYRIDINDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ANTIVIRALE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE DIESE ENTHûLT | ||
Former [2005/27] | 6-METHYLPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THEREOF AND ANTIVIRAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | ||
Former [2005/27] | DERIVES DE 6-METHYLPYRIDINE, PROCEDE D'ELABORATION, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ANTIVIRALE RENFERMANT CES DERIVES | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | IE | 02.10.2007 | LU | 02.10.2007 | FR | 31.10.2007 | IT | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | GB | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | DE | 16.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/43] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
LU | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
LU | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GB | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3878206 (SPENCER CLAUDE F, et al); | [A]EP0187705 (NORWICH EATON PHARMA [US]); | [A]WO0178648 (DONG WHA PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A] - SNYDER H. R. ET AL., "Imidazo[4-5f]quinolines III: Antibacterial 7-methyl-9-(substituted arylamino)imidazo[4,5-f]quinolines", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1997), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 1204 - 1206, XP008070715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660842 |