EP1583620 - METHOD FOR FORMING A SHEET METAL COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/41] | METHOD FOR FIXING THE POSITION OF A PULL-TAB WITH A STEEP ANTI ROTATION DEVICE FORMED FROM THE PANEL OF A SHEET METAL COVER | ||
[2006/36] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ball Packaging Europe GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 115 40880 Ratingen / DE | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIECK, Hajo Schloss Gelsdorf, Herrenhaus 53501 Grafschaft / DE | 02 /
GRAY, Martin 7 Forest Road, Woodlands Estate Llay, Wrexham, Flintshire LL12 OUB / GB | 03 /
CHALK, Richard 8 Llys Argoed Mynydd Isa, Mold, Flintshire CH7 6TX / GB | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Spreepalais am Dom Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Fricke, Joachim, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03808249.1 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003DE04282 | Priority number, date | DE20031000914 | 13.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300914 | DE20031019971 | 05.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10319971 | DE20031025561 | 21.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10325561 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004065033 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583620 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583620 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1583620 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/00 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B21D51/383 (EP,US);
B65D17/4012 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0014 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSFORMEN EINES BLECHDECKELS | [2007/12] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A SHEET METAL COVER | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FORMER UN COUVERCLE EN TOLE | [2006/36] |
Former [2005/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR LAGEFIXIERUNG EINER GRIFFLASCHE MIT EINER - AUS DEM PANEL EINES BLECHDECKELS - AUSGEFORMTEN ROTATIONSSPERRSICKE (STEEP ANTI ROTATION DEVICE) | ||
Former [2005/41] | METHOD FOR FIXING THE POSITION OF A PULL-TAB WITH A STEEP ANTI ROTATION DEVICE FORMED FROM THE PANEL OF A SHEET METAL COVER | ||
Former [2005/41] | PROCEDE POUR FIXER UNE LANGUETTE DE MANIPULATION AVEC MOULURE DE BLOCAGE DE ROTATION, FORMEE A PARTIR DE LA SURFACE D'UN COUVERCLE EN TOLE (DISPOSITIF ANTI ROTATION DE FORTE INCLINAISON) | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 20.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE CROWN Packaging UK PLC Downsview Road, Wantage Oxfordshire, OX12 9BP / GB Opponent's representative Ratliff, Ismay Hilary, et al, et al CROWN Packaging UK plc, Downsview Road Wantage Oxon, OX12 9BP / GB | [2008/06] | 01.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.12.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.09.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.03.2007 | CZ | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | RO | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | BG | 28.06.2007 | ES | 09.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | AT | 23.12.2007 | LU | 23.12.2007 | CH | 31.12.2007 | LI | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | IT | 23.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | [2013/51] |
Former [2010/31] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
TR | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
HU | 29.09.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
TR | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
HU | 29.09.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 28.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09226762 ; | [XA]US3868918 (SMITH JR GEORGE L, et al) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09226762 A 19970902 (HOKKAI CAN CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5799816 | Opposition | US3191564 | US3871314 | US5119664 | US5918499 | EP1055468 |