EP1567014 - RAPID ONE-STEP METHOD FOR GENERATION OF ANTIGEN LOADED DENDRITIC CELL VACCINE FROM PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute Suite 125, 3434 Live Oak Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANCHEREAU, Jacques, F. 6730 Northhaven Road Dallas, TX 75230 / US | 02 /
PALUCKA, Anna K. 3000 Blackburn St., 2522 Dallas, TX 75402 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
BANCHEREAU, Jacques, F. 6730 Northhaven Road Dallas, TX 75230 / US | ||
02 /
PALUCKA, Anna K. 101 North Brookside Drive Apartment 106 Dallas, TX 75214 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Weber, Martin, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03808435.6 | 04.12.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003US38553 | Priority number, date | US20020430791P | 04.12.2002 Original published format: US 430791 P | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050855 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1567014 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567014 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, A61K45/00, A61K47/00, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/0784 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/4637 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
A61K39/464456 (EP);
A61K39/464486 (EP);
A61K39/464491 (EP);
A61K39/464492 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5152 (US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | A01N63/00, A61K45/00, A61K47/00, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | EINSTUFIGES SCHNELLVERFAHREN ZURHERSTELLUNG EINES ANTIGENBELADENEN DENDRITENZELLIMPFSTOFFS AUS VORSTUFEN | [2005/35] | English: | RAPID ONE-STEP METHOD FOR GENERATION OF ANTIGEN LOADED DENDRITIC CELL VACCINE FROM PRECURSORS | [2005/35] | French: | PROCEDE RAPIDE DE PRODUCTION EN UNE ETAPE D'UN VACCIN A BASE DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES CHARGEES EN ANTIGENE A PARTIR DE PRECURSEURS | [2011/37] |
Former [2005/35] | PROCEDE RAPIDE DE PRODUCTION EN UNE ETAPE D'UN VACCIN CELLULAIRE DENDRITIQUE CHARGE EN ANTIGENE A PARTIR DE PRECURSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2009 | 16.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011505.4 / EP2301356 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HU | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | IE | 04.12.2011 | LU | 04.12.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GB | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | ES | 08.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
LU | 04.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
LU | 04.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
LU | 04.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.12.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GB | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 28.09.2011 | |
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 28.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6004807 (BANCHEREAU JACQUES [FR], et al) [AD] 21 * column 6, line 47 - line 57 *; | [X]WO0121653 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 14-24,28-30 * page 2, line 25 - line 28 * * page 30, line 4 - page 32, line 5 * * claims 3,10 * * page 32, line 7 - page 34, line 29 *; | [X]WO0204603 (EPPENDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 14-21 * claims 19,20 *; | [X] - MORSE MICHAEL A ET AL, "Immunotherapy of cancer using dendritic cell", CYTOKINES CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR THERAPY, (199803), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1368-4736, pages 35 - 44, XP009058112 [X] 14-24,28-30 * the whole document * | [A] - FOLCIK R M ET AL, "HIV-1 infection of placental cord blood monocyte-derived dendritic cells.", JOURNAL OF HEMATOTHERAPY & STEM CELL RESEARCH. OCT 2001, (200110), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1525-8165, pages 609 - 620, XP009058071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/152581601753193823 | International search | [Y] - PALUCKA A K ET AL, "Blood dendritic cells: Multi-potential differentiation or committed subsets?", BLOOD, (19991115), vol. 94, no. 10, page 48A, XP002903528 | [Y] - GLUCKMAN J C ET AL, "In vitro generation of human dendritic cells and cell therapy", CYTOKINES. CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR THERAPHY, (1997), vol. 3, pages 187 - 196, XP000938414 | [Y] - CHOI G S ET AL, "Analysis of Methods for the Generation of Dendritic Cells from Human Peripheral Blood Monocytes.", YONSEI MEDICAL JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 41, no. 5, pages 642 - 650, XP002903508 | [Y] - FEUERSTEIN B ET AL, "A method for the production of cryopreserved aliquots of antigen-preloaded, mature dendritic cells ready for clinical use", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2000), vol. 245, pages 15 - 29, XP004218805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00269-6 |