EP1553335 - RECIPROCATING SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK CORPORATION 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Nok Corporation 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Hidenori, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 02 /
TAKENO, Kazuki, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 03 /
YAMANE, Ichiro, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 04 /
MUNEKATA, Shinobu, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 05 /
YAMASHINA, Katsumi, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 06 /
WATANABE, Masaru, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
ARAI, Hidenori, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKENO, Kazuki, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMANE, Ichiro, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | |||
04 /
MUNEKATA, Shinobu, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMASHINA, Katsumi, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | |||
06 /
WATANABE, Masaru, c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/06] |
Former [2005/28] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03808888.6 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003JP11995 | Priority number, date | JP20020300650 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002300650 | [2005/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036095 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553335 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553335 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F16F9/36 (EP,US);
F16J15/32 (KR);
F16J15/3232 (EP,US);
F16J15/3236 (EP,US);
F16J15/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/05] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HUBDICHTUNG | [2005/28] | English: | RECIPROCATING SEAL | [2005/28] | French: | JOINT ALTERNATIF | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2005 | Translation filed | 31.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63168365U (NOK KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]GB2256687 (GEN MOTORS FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract ** page 9, line 2 - line 27; figures 1,5,6 * | International search | [Y]JP2001355740 (NOK CORP); | [Y]JPS63168365U ; | [Y]JPH0235272 (SAKAGAMI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPH0684067U | by applicant | JPS63168365U | GB2256687 |