EP1558648 - HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST CD20 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked by proprietor Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2021 | New entry: Proprietor files request for revocation | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genmab A/S Bredgade 34 E 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2013/15] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Genmab A/S Bredgade 34 P.O. Box 9068 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Genmab A/S Toldbodgade 33 1253 Copenhagen K / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEELING, Jessica@Woodmill Cottage 299 Woodmill Lane Swaithling Southampton SO18 2JR / GB | 02 /
RUULS, Sigrid Hessenweg 121B NL-3731 JG De Bilt / NL | 03 /
GLENNIE, Martin 1 Thornhill Road Southampton SO16 7AU / GB | 04 /
VAN DE WINKEL, Jan, G., J. Werlengde Slotlaan 80 NL-3707 CK Zeist / NL | 05 /
PARREN, Paul Werdorperwaard 17 NL-3984 PR Odijk / NL | 06 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen Solkrogen 6 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | 07 /
BAADSGAARD, Ole, D., M., Sc. Tuborg Sundpark 10 2900 Hellerup / DK | 08 /
HUANG, Haichun 4329 Crestwood Street Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2012/02] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
TEELING, Jessica Woodmill Cottage 299 Woodmill Lane Swaithling Southampton SO18 2JR / GB | ||
02 /
RUULS, Sigrid Hessenweg 121B NL-3731 JG De Bilt / NL | |||
03 /
GLENNIE, Martin 1 Thornhill Road Southampton SO16 7AU / GB | |||
04 /
VAN DE WINKEL, Jan, G., J. Werlengde Slotlaan 80 NL-3707 CK Zeist / NL | |||
05 /
PARREN, Paul Werdorperwaard 17 NL-3984 PR Odijk / NL | |||
06 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen Solkrogen 6 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | |||
07 /
BAADSGAARD, Ole, D., M., Sc. Tuborg Sundpark 10 2900 Hellerup / DK | |||
08 /
HUANG, Haichun 4329 Crestwood Street Fremont, CA 94538 / US | |||
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
TEELING, Jessica Lisdoddelaan 70 NL-1562 SN Krommenie / NL | ||
02 /
RUULS, Sigrid Hessenweg 121B NL-3731 JG De Bilt / NL | |||
03 /
GLENNIE, Martin 1 Thornhill Road Southampton SO16 7AU / GB | |||
04 /
VAN DE WINKEL, Jan, G., J. Werlengde Slotlaan 80 NL-3707 CK Zeist / NL | |||
05 /
PARREN, Paul Werdorperwaard 17 NL-3984 PR Odijk / NL | |||
06 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen Solkrogen 6 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | |||
07 /
BAADSGAARD, Ole, D., M., Sc. Kyrkogatan 3 S-211 22 Malmo / SE | |||
08 /
HUANG, Haichun 2425 Sueno Way Fremont, CA 94539 / US | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/31] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. Kemp & Co 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03809145.0 | 17.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US33057 | Priority number, date | US20020419163P | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 419163 P | US20030460028P | 02.04.2003 Original published format: US 460028 P | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004035607 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558648 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558648 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C12N5/22, C12N5/24, C12N15/63 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K16/4258 (EP,US);
C12N5/16 (KR);
G01N33/686 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/54 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | 06.05.2005 | LT | 06.05.2005 | LV | 06.05.2005 | MK | 06.05.2005 | Title | German: | HUMANE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CD20 | [2005/31] | English: | HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST CD20 | [2005/31] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX HUMAINS ANTI-CD20 | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 06.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2011 | Observations by third parties | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP10013084.8 / EP2330130 | EP10013085.5 / EP2316856 | EP17179855.6 / EP3284753 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjördur / IS Opponents representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Actavis group PTC ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjördur / IS Opponents representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | 19.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.03.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.10.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/18] | 30.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.12.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Revocation procedure | 26.03.2021 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | ADMISSIBLE | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that patent will be revoked | 05.05.2021 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | 26.03.2021 | Fee for revocation paid |
Former [2021/18] | 26.03.2021 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | |
ADMISSIBLE | |||
05.05.2021 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | ||
26.03.2021 | Fee for revocation paid | ||
Former [N/P] | 26.03.2021 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | |
[2021/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2009 | Decision despatched | 23.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/15] |
Former [2012/24] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9411026 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | [YD]US5770429 (LONBERG NILS [US], et al) [YD] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0009160 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6120767 (ROBINSON RANDY R [US], et al) [Y] 1-40,44 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002009427 (WOLIN MAURICE J [US], et al) [X] 1-40,44 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063] * * claims 1-9 * [Y] 41-43; | [XY]WO0222212 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-37,41-44 * the whole document * [Y] 38-40; | [X] - GAZZANO-SANTORO H ET AL, "A non-radioactive complement-dependent cytotoxicity assay for anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970328), vol. 202, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 163 - 171, XP004126276 [X] 45-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00002-1 | [Y] - EDWARDS J C W ET AL, "Sustained improvement in rheumatoid arthritis following a protocol designed to deplete B lymphocytes", RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (200102), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 205 - 211, XP002348931 [Y] 41-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.2.205 | [A] - VAN SPRIEL A B ET AL, "Immunotherapeutic perspective for bispecific antibodies", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 391 - 397, XP004215167 [A] 36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01659-5 | International search | [Y]WO0212437 (SCHOOTEN WIM VAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2002064823 (WELCHER ANDREW A [US], et al) | Examination | - TEELING JESSICA L ET AL, "The biological activity of human CD20 monoclonal antibodies is linked to unique epitopes on CD20.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 JUL 2006, (20060701), vol. 177, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 362 - 371 | - KLIMKA A ET AL, "Human anti-CD30 recombinant antibodies by guided phage antibody selection using cell panning.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER JUL 2000, (200007), vol. 83, no. 2, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 252 - 260 | - BARBAS S M ET AL, "Human autoantibody recognition of DNA.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 28 MAR 1995, (19950328), vol. 92, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2529 - 2533 | - BEIBOER S H ET AL, "Guided selection of a pan carcinoma specific antibody reveals similar binding characteristics yet structural divergence between the original murine antibody and its human equivalent.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY 25 FEB 2000, (20000225), vol. 296, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 833 - 849 | - POLYMENIS M ET AL, "Critical binding site amino acids of anti-Z-DNA single chain Fv molecules. Role of heavy and light chain CDR3 and relationship to autoantibody activity.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 JUN 1994, (19940601), vol. 152, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5318 - 5329 | - DITZEL H J ET AL, "Determinants of polyreactivity in a large panel of recombinant human antibodies from HIV-1 infection.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 JUL 1996, (19960715), vol. 157, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 739 - 749 | - RADER C ET AL, "A phage display approach for rapid antibody humanization: designed combinatorial V gene libraries.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 21 JUL 1998, (19980721), vol. 95, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8910 - 8915 | - BARBAS SHANA M ET AL, "Recognition of DNA by synthetic antibodies", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1994), vol. 116, no. 5, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2161 - 2162 | by applicant | US4474893 | WO8800052 | US4946778 | US4954617 | WO9410332 | US2003017534 | US2003118592 | US2003133939 | - GRAZIANO, R.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 155, no. 10, pages 4996 - 5002 | - MORTON, H.C. ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 16, pages 423 - 440 | - MONTEIRO, R.C. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1764 | - D. M. KRANZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1981), vol. 78, page 5807 | - KARPOVSKY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1984), vol. 160, page 1686 | - LIU, MA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 8648 | - BEHRING, INS. MITT., (1985), no. 78, pages 118 - 132 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83 | - GLENNIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 2367 - 2375 |