EP1559107 - BILAYER CMP PROCESS TO IMPROVE SURFACE ROUGHNESS OF MAGNETIC STACK IN MRAM TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | |||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | |||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
For all designated states IBM International Business Machines Corporation 2070 Route 52 Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTRINI, Greg 10 Alpine Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | 02 /
HUMMEL, John, P. 282 Killearn Road Millbrook, NY 12545 / US | 03 /
KRISHNAN, Mahadevaiyer 18 Larchmont Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | 04 /
LOW, Kia-Seng 19 Stephen Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Müller . Hoffmann & Partner, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03810441.0 | 05.11.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP12353 | Priority number, date | US20020289488 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: US 289488 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004042735 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559107 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559107 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G11C11/16 (EP,KR,US);
H10N50/01 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H01F10/26 (EP,US);
H01F10/3254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/09] |
Former [2005/31] | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL | Title | German: | ZWEISCHICHT-CMP-PROZESS ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER OBERFLÄCHENRAUHHEIT EINES MAGNETISCHEN STAPELS IN MRAM-TECHNOLOGIE | [2005/31] | English: | BILAYER CMP PROCESS TO IMPROVE SURFACE ROUGHNESS OF MAGNETIC STACK IN MRAM TECHNOLOGY | [2005/31] | French: | PROCEDE CMP BICOUCHE DESTINE A AMELIORER LA RUGOSITE DE SURFACE D'UN EMPILEMENT MAGNETIQUE DANS UN TECHNOLOGIE MRAM | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0219338 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2002098705 (LOW KIA-SENG [US]) |