EP1567189 - MALARIA VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Statens Serum Institut Artillerivej 5 DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2009/22] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Statens Serum Institut Artillerivej 5 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEISEN, Michael N.J. Fjords Allé 20, 4. Th DK-1937 Frederiksberg C / DK | 02 /
JEPSEN, Søren Kikhanebakken 27 DK-2840 Holte / DK | [2009/21] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
THEISEN, Michael N.J. Fjords Allé 20, 4. Th DK-1937 Frederiksberg C / DK | ||
02 /
JEPSEN, Soren Kikhanebakken 27 DK-2840 Holte / DK | |||
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
THEISEN, Michael N.J. Fjords Allé 20, 4. Th DK-1937 Frederiksberg C / DK | ||
02 /
JEPSEN, Soren Kkikhanebakken 27 DK-2840 Holte / DK | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2005/35] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen OE / DK | Application number, filing date | 03810941.9 | 06.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003DK00759 | Priority number, date | DK20020001741 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: DK 200201741 | DK20030001307 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: DK 200301307 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043488 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567189 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567189 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/015, C12N15/30, A61P33/06, C07K14/445 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/445 (EP,US);
A61K39/015 (EP,US);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | A61K39/015, C12N15/30, A61P33/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MALARIA-VAKZINE | [2005/35] | English: | MALARIA VACCINE | [2005/35] | French: | VACCIN CONTRE LA MALARIA | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | LU | 06.11.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
LU | 06.11.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
LU | 06.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9002811 (STATENS SERUMINSTITUT [DK]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0050077 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 10, line 22 - line 28 *; | [XY] - CARVALHO, L. J. M. ET AL, "Malaria Vaccine: Candidate Antigens, Mechanisms, Constraints and Prospects", SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 56, pages 327 - 343, XP002273865 [X] 1 * see table 2 (MSP-3 and GLURP), and page 336-37 (Multistage appraches) * [Y] 2-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-3083.2002.01160.x | [Y] - OEUVRAY, CLAUDE ET AL, "Cytophilic Immunoglobulin Responses to Plasmodium falciparum Glutamate-Rich Protein Are Correlated with Protection against Clinical Malaria in Dielmo, Senegal", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200005), vol. 68, no. 5, pages 2617 - 2620, XP002273866 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.68.5.2617-2620.2000 | [Y] - OEUVRAY, C ET AL, "Merozoite surface protein-3: a malaria protein inducing antibodies that promote Plasmodium falciparum killing by cooperation with blood monocytes", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, no. 5, pages 1594 - 1602, XP002273867 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | [Y] - CARVALHO, L. J. M. ET AL, "IM-95-Immunization of saimiri sciureus monkeys with MSP-3 and glurp, two plasmodium falciparum antigens targets of protective antibodies", MEMORIAS DO INSTITUTO OSWALDO CRUZ, (199911), vol. 94, no. 11, page 216, XP002273868 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S0074-02761999000700016 | [A] - BREDMOSE, L. ET AL, "Development of a heterologous gene expression system for use in lactococcus lactis", RECOMBINANT PROTEIN PRODUCTION WITH PROKARYOTIC AND EUKARYOTIC CELLS, (2001), pages 269 - 275, XP002274030 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |