EP1563188 - MOTOR-PUMP UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINKEL, Dieter Bahnstrasse 21 65824 Schwalbachsen / DE | 02 /
BARTSCH, Thomas Seelbacher Grund 8 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Sven Kurpfalzring 88 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 04 /
BRIESEWITZ, Rüdiger Habsburgerallee 85 60385 Frankfurt/M / DE | 05 /
NIESCHER, Axel Eschborner Landstrasse 55 60489 Frankfurt/M / DE | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 03810968.2 | 06.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003EP12363 | Priority number, date | DE2002152622 | 11.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10252622 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044427 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563188 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/00, F04B17/03, F04B1/04 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B60T8/368 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
F04B1/04 (EP,US);
F04B1/0404 (EP,US);
F04B1/0443 (EP,US);
F04B17/03 (EP,US);
F04B53/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/09] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOTOR-PUMPEN-AGGREGAT | [2005/33] | English: | MOTOR-PUMP UNIT | [2005/33] | French: | ENSEMBLE MOTEUR-POMPE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 11.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/34] | Divisional application(s) | EP06123309.4 / EP1746288 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE19927658 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10023947 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5620311 (WETZEL GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19922297 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |