EP1573592 - MONITOR FILE STORAGE AND TRANSFER ON A PEER-TO-PEER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bigchampagne, LLC. 881 Memorial Drive, Suite 102 Atlanta, GA 30316 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARLAND, Eric 2153 Cooley Place Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | 02 /
TOLL, Adam, D. 170 Boulevard SE, H307 Atlanta, GA 30312 / US | 03 /
ALLISON, Zack 691 John Wesley Dobbs Avenue, Apartment G Atlanta, GA 30312 / US | 04 /
ALLISON, Adam 264-B Elmira Place Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | 05 /
ALLISON, Thomas, J. 30 Westminster Drive Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2005/37] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03811622.4 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US36517 | Priority number, date | US20020426904P | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 426904 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004046969 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573592 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F7/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
G06F16/148 (EP,US);
G06F16/1834 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSDATEISPEICHERUNG UND TRANSFERIN EINEM PEER-TO-PEER-NETZWERK | [2005/37] | English: | MONITOR FILE STORAGE AND TRANSFER ON A PEER-TO-PEER NETWORK | [2005/37] | French: | CONTROLE DE STOCKAGE ET DE TRANSFERT DE FICHIERS SUR UN RESEAU DE SYSTEMES HOMOLOGUES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 13.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0193064 (EMIKOLO NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002062336 (TEODOSIU DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] *; | [X]WO02076003 (IMESH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 37 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 5, line 2 - line 9 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2002152261 (ARKIN JED [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2002184224 (HAFF MAURICE W [US], et al) [XP] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0180] * * claim - * * figure 22 *; | [XP]US2003009587 (HARROW IVAN P [IE], et al) [XP] 1-38 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0083] *; | [X] - OSOKINE, S., "Search Optimization in the Distributed Networks", GROUTER.NET: GNUTELLA FILE SHARING AND DISTRIBUTION NETWORK, (20021015), pages 1 - 46, URL: http://www.grouter.net/gnutella/search.htm, (20080418), XP002477305 [X] 1-38 * Pages 22 - 38, Paragraph "5. Mutual Index Caching" * | [A] - "Multipoint binary file transfer protocol; T.127 (08/95)", ITU-T STANDARD IN FORCE (I), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA,, CH, (19950811), no. T127 8/95, XP017403421 [A] 1,9,16,24,31,35,37 * Paragraph "8.10 Remote directory listing" * | International search | [Y]US2002073075 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al); | [Y]US2002138471 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al); | [A]US2003018621 (STEINER DONALD [US], et al); | [YP]US2003035035 (KOMPLIN STEVEN ROBERT [US], et al) |