EP1565847 - Method and System for Linking Lecacy DVD Discs to related Websites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/34] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LINKING LEGACY DVD DISCS TO RELATED WEB SITES | ||
[2008/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLY, Declan, Philips Electronics China 33/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / IE | 02 /
WANG, Bei, Philips Electronics China 33/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / CN | 03 /
PENG, Yang, Philips Electronics China 33/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / CN | 04 /
HE, Dahua, Philips Electronics China 33/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / CN | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03811833.7 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003IB05285 | Priority number, date | CN2002152299 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: CN 02152299 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049207 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565847 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565847 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G06F16/95 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Verknüpfen von alten DVD Disks mit zugehörigen Websites | [2008/26] | English: | Method and System for Linking Lecacy DVD Discs to related Websites | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé et système déstinés à relier des vieux disques DVD à des sites web. | [2008/26] |
Former [2005/34] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERKN PFEN VON LEGACY-DVD-DISKS MIT VERWANDTEN WEBSITES | ||
Former [2005/34] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LINKING LEGACY DVD DISCS TO RELATED WEB SITES | ||
Former [2005/34] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DESTINES A RELIER DES DISQUES DVD PATRIMONIAUX A DES SITES WEB | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2008 | 21.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2008 | BE | 19.11.2008 | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IT | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | IE | 20.11.2008 | LU | 20.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2014/32] |
Former [2010/49] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CY | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
TR | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CY | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
TR | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CY | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9825269 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1 * abstract ** page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 9 *; | [X]WO0215024 (IDVDBOX INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - line 24 * * page 7, line 18 - line 21; figure 5 *; | [X]WO0246968 (OPENGLOBE INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016]; figures 2A-2C * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figures 3A,3B * |