EP1575520 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF AN AGGLUTINATION REAGENT FOR RAPID DETECTION OF TYPHOID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defense Research & Development Organisation Ministry of Defence Government of India B-341 Sena Bhawan, DHQ P.O. New Delhi 110 011 / IN | [2007/45] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Defense Research & Development Organisation Ministry of Defence Government of India B-341 Sena Bhawan, DHQ P.O. New Delhi 110 011 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAI, Ganga, Prasad C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | 02 /
AGARWAL, Gauri, Shankar C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | 03 /
SHARMA, Shri, Krishna C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | 04 /
JAISWAL, Devendra, Kumar C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | 05 /
SHEKHAR, Krishanamurthy C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | 06 /
ARORA, Kajal C/o Deptt. of Biochemistry Delhi University, Smooth Campus Benito Juarez Road New Delhi 110 002 / IN | 07 /
CHAUDHARY, Vijay Kumar C/o Deptt. of Biochemistry Delhi University, South Campus Benito Juarez Road New Delhi 110 002 / IN | [2007/25] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
RAI, Ganga, Prasad C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | ||
02 /
AGARWAL, Gauri, Shankar C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | |||
03 /
SHARMA, Shri, Krishna C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | |||
04 /
JAISWAL, Devendra, Kumar C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | |||
05 /
SHEKHAR, Krishanamurthy C/o Defence Res. & Dev. Establishment Jhansi Road Gwalior 474 002 / IN | |||
06 /
ARORA, Kajal C/o Deptt. of Biochemistry Delhi University, Smooth Campus Benito Juarez Road New Delhi 110 002 / IN | |||
07 /
CHAUDHARY, Vijay Kumar C/o Dept. of Biochemistry Delhi University, South Campus enito Juarez Road New Delhi 110 002 / IN | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 03811861.8 | 03.09.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003IN00296 | Priority number, date | INDE11872002 | 26.11.2002 Original published format: IN DE11872002 | INDE02712003 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: IN DE02712003 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004047721 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575520 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575520 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, G01N33/569 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/56916 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | GB [2006/11] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AGGLUTINATIONSREAGENS FÜR DIE SCHNELLBESTIMMUNG VON TYPHUS | [2007/25] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF AN AGGLUTINATION REAGENT FOR RAPID DETECTION OF TYPHOID | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D`UN REACTIF D`AGGLUTINATION DES TINE A LA DETECTION RAPIDE DE LA TYPHOIDE | [2007/25] |
Former [2005/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINESAGGLUTINATIONSREAGENS FÜR DIE SCHNELLBESTIMMUNG VON TYPHUS | ||
Former [2005/38] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D UN REACTIF D AGGLUTINATION DES TINE A LA DETECTION RAPIDE DE LA TYPHOIDE | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4960715 (HADFIELD SUSAN G [GB], et al); | [X]WO9631777 (MACQUARIE RESEARCH LIMITED [AU], et al); | [X]EP0599803 (WALDHEIM PHARMAZEUTIKA GMBH [AT]); | [X] - LIM P.L. ET AL, "A one-step two-particle latex immunoassay for the detection of Salmonella typhi endotoxin.", CA DATABASE, Database accession no. (114:137509), XP002992592 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS., (1990), vol. 135, no. 1-2, pages 257 - 261 |