EP1565758 - METHOD OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE HEALTHCARE AS Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen 0401 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states GE Healthcare AS Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen 0401 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states GE Healthcare AS Nycoveien 2 0485 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Amersham Health AS Nycoveien 1-2, PO Box 4220, Nydalen 0401 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXELSSON, Oskar, Amersham Health R & D AB GE Healthcare AS, Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen, N-0401 Oslo / NO | 02 /
GOLMAN, Klaes, Amersham Health R & D AB GE Healthcare AS, Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen, N-0401 Oslo / NO | 03 /
MANSSON, Sven, Amersham Health R & D AB GE Healthcare AS, Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen, N-0401 Oslo / NO | 04 /
PETERSSON, Stefan, Amersham Health R & D AB GE Healthcare AS, Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4330 Nydalen, N-0401 Oslo / NO | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/34] | 01 /
AXELSSON, Oskar, Amersham Health R & D AB P.A. Hanssons v. 41 S-205 12 Malmö / SE | ||
02 /
GOLMAN, Klaes, Amersham Health R & D AB P.A. Hanssons v. 41 S-205 12 Malmö / SE | |||
03 /
MANSSON, Sven, Amersham Health R & D AB P.A. Hanssons v. 41 S-205 12 Malmö / SE | |||
04 /
PETERSSON, Stefan, Amersham Health R & D AB P.A. Hanssons v. 41 S-205 12 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Canning, Lewis R., et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Canning, Lewis R., et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Canning, Lewis R., et al GE Healthcare Limited, Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03811966.5 | 27.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003NO00395 | Priority number, date | NO20020005711 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: NO 20025711 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048988 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565758 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565758 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/28, A61B5/055 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/055 (EP);
G01R33/286 (EP);
G01R33/5601 (EP);
A61B5/06 (EP);
A61B5/061 (EP);
A61B5/7289 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE MAGNETISCHE RESONANZBILDGEBUNG | [2006/30] | English: | METHOD OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING | [2005/34] | French: | METHODE D'IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [2005/34] |
Former [2005/34] | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE MAGNETISCHE RESONANZBILGEBUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2006 | 07.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | BE | 10.01.2007 | CH | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | CZ | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | EE | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | LI | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | RO | 10.01.2007 | SI | 10.01.2007 | SK | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | BG | 11.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | HU | 11.07.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9935508 (LEUNBACH IB ;COCKBAIN JULIAN (GB); NYCOMED IMAGING AS (NO); HANSSO) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,11,12,14,15,17; | [YA]WO9822022 (ITI MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 6,7,11,12,14,15,17 * page 12, line 11 - page 15, line 11 * * page 17, line 6 - page 21, line 29 * [A] 1; | [A]US5154179 (RATNER ADAM V) [A] 18,19 * column 5, line 23 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A]WO02088766 (HANLEY PETER ;OXFORD INSTR PLC (GB)) [A] 1,5,7,10-14,18 * see whole document, cited in the application *; | [A]US5211166 (SEPPONEN RAIMO) [A] 1,5,7,10-14,18 * see whole document, cited in the application * |