EP1567568 - 1-Buten copolymers and process for preparing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/35] | 1-BUTEN COPOLYMERS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM | ||
[2008/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESCONI, Luigi Via Arianuova, 56/B I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
PELLICONI, Anteo Via Volta, 22 I-45030 Occhiobello / IT | 03 /
GARAGNANI, Enea Viale Mons Natale Mosconi, 75 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Sacco, Marco, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 03812152.1 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003EP12944 | Priority number, date | EP20020080121 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02080121 | US20020431802P | 09.12.2002 Original published format: US 431802 P | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050713 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1567568 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567568 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/08, C08F4/6592 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C08F210/08 (EP,KR);
C08F4/642 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/08, C08F4/65927 (EP);
C08F210/08, C08F210/16, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/20 (EP) |
Former IPC [2005/35] | C08F210/08, C08F4/642 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1-Buten-Copolymere und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/29] | English: | 1-Buten copolymers and process for preparing them | [2008/29] | French: | Procédé de préparation de copolymères 1-butène et copolymères obtenus selon ce procédé | [2008/29] |
Former [2005/35] | 1-BUTEN-COPOLYMERE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2005/35] | 1-BUTEN COPOLYMERS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM | ||
Former [2005/35] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COPOLYMERES 1-BUTENE ET COPOLYMERES OBTENUS SELON CE PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | IE | 14.11.2009 | LU | 14.11.2009 | BG | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
LU | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
LU | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62119213 ; | [X]JPS60262804 ; | [X]EP0353318 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 11-15 * table 1 * * example 4 ** comparative examples 4,5 *; | [PX]WO02100909 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-15 * examples 14-19 * * table 3 * * claims 1-6,11,12 *; | [PXD]WO02100908 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [PXD] 1-15 * examples 10-13 * * table 3 * * claims 1-6 * * catalysts A-1, A-2, A-3, A-5 on page 11 *; | [PX]WO03042258 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-15 * examples 3-6 * * table 1 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X] - SUHM J ET AL, "Influence of metallocene structues on ethene copolymerization with 1-butene and 1-octene", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. A, CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1998), vol. 128, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 215 - 227, XP002218351 [X] 1-15 * page 222; examples 10-14; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(97)00175-1 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871114), vol. 0113, no. 49, Database accession no. (C - 456), & JP62119213 A 19870530 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [X] 11-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 07, Database accession no. 1986-044999, XP002280802 & JPS60262804 A 19851226 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 11-15 * abstract * |