EP1570324 - METHOD FOR DYNAMIC AUTOMATION USING COLLABORATIVE ELEMENTS, AND CONTROL SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LogObject AG Baslerstrasse 30 8048 Zürich / CH | [2009/01] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Logobject AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSI, Roberto Schützenhausstrasse 92 CH-8424 Embrach / CH | 02 /
WULLSCHLEGER, Felix, H. Uetlibergstrasse 86 CH-8045 Zürich / CH | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
ROSSI, Roberto Dorfstrasse 26 CH-8427 Freienstein / CH | ||
02 /
WULLSCHLEGER, Felix, H. Uetlibergstrasse 86 CH-8045 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Becker, Konrad Diltec AG Technopark Zürich Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Becker, Konrad Diltec AG Technopark Zürich Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/36] | Becker, Konrad Diltec AG, Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03812542.3 | 05.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003CH00803 | Priority number, date | CH20020002116 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: CH 211602 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053605 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570324 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570324 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32388 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33006 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33008 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR EINE DYNAMISCHE AUTOMATISIERUNG MIT KOLLABORATIVEN ELEMENTEN UND LEITSYSTEM DAZU | [2005/36] | English: | METHOD FOR DYNAMIC AUTOMATION USING COLLABORATIVE ELEMENTS, AND CONTROL SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2005/36] | French: | PROCEDE D'AUTOMATISATION DYNAMIQUE COMPORTANT DES ELEMENTS COLLABORATIFS ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
SI | 25.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10244431 ; | [X]JPH10101222 ; | [X]EP0700841 (DATA LOGIC OPTIK ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [X] 1,15-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5825981 (MATSUDA TOMOO [JP]) [X] 1,15-17 * column 6, line 42 - line 67 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10244431 A 19980914 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,15-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10101222 A 19980421 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,15-17 * abstract * |