EP1583548 - HLA-A1, A2 -A3,-A24,-B7,AND -B44 TUMOR ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN PEPTIDES AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epimmune Inc. 5820 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEOGH, Elissa, A. 7999 Caminito Dia 2 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
SOUTHWOOD, Scott 10679 Strathmore Drive Santee, CA 92071 / US | 03 /
FIKES, John, D. 4671 Robbins Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
SETTE, Alessandro 5551 Linda Rosa Avenue La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03812851.8 | 10.12.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003US38949 | Priority number, date | US20020432017P | 10.12.2002 Original published format: US 432017 P | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004052917 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583548 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K38/00 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/4746 (EP,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HLA-A1, A2 -A3,-A24,-B7 UND -B44TUMOR-ASSOZIIERTE ANTIGENPEPTIDE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2005/41] | English: | HLA-A1, A2 -A3,-A24,-B7,AND -B44 TUMOR ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN PEPTIDES AND COMPOSITIONS | [2005/41] | French: | PEPTIDES DIRIGES CONTRE DES ANTIGENES ASSOCIES AUX TUMEURS HLA-A1, A2 -A3,-A24,-B7,AND -B44 ET COMPOSITIONS | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 19.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP07023757.3 / EP1903056 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0141741 (EPIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-22 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 20 * * page 11, lines 3-14 * * page 25, line 20 - page 28, line 17 * * example 1 * * tables 6,10 * * claims 1,18,31 * * sequence 19 *; | [X]WO0142270 (EPIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, lines 1-5 * * page 5, lines 1-21 * * page 9, lines 34-38 * * page 38, lines 1-34 * * page 48, lines 5-31 * * page 49, lines 2-36 * * tables IV,V,VII-XI,XV-XX,XXII-XXXI ** claims 1-34 *; | [X]WO0220616 (EPIMMUNE INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, lines 3-10 * * page 15, lines 10-15 * * tables 3,4 * * sequence 68 * | International search | [X]WO9938973 (CORIXA CORP [US]) |