EP1581173 - ENCAPSULATED MATERIAL RELEASED TO GENERATE PERCEIVABLE SENSORIAL INDICIA OF DISCRETE EVENT OCCURENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venture Management Alliance, LLC 204 Walnut Street, Suite C Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLS, John E. 525 East Drake Street, Apt. 310B Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
PUTT, Jeffrey W. 4125 Suncrest Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 03 /
DELINE, Kenneth E. 1720 Lindenwood Drive Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03812959.9 | 10.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US39472 | Priority number, date | US20020432471P | 10.12.2002 Original published format: US 432471 P | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004052307 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1581173 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREIGESETZTES VERKAPSELTES MATERIAL ZURERZEUGUNG VON WAHRNEHMBAREN SENSORISCHEN INDIZIEN FÜR DAS AUFTRETEN EINESDISKRETEN EREIGNISSES | [2005/40] | English: | ENCAPSULATED MATERIAL RELEASED TO GENERATE PERCEIVABLE SENSORIAL INDICIA OF DISCRETE EVENT OCCURENCE | [2005/40] | French: | MATERIAU EN CAPSULES LIBERE POUR LA GENERATION D'INDICATIONS SENSORIELLES D'EVENEMENT DISCRET | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2717184 (ROTHAN GABRIEL [FR]) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]US5753244 (REYNOLDS TAYLOR W [US], et al) [X] 1-24* column 2, line 57 - line 67; claims 1-8 *; | [X]FR2805162 (CASELLA JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-24 * claims 1-10 * | International search | [Y]US4756906 (SWEENY NORMAN P [US]); | [Y]US5320835 (PAHLCK HAROLD E [US], et al); | [X]US5518730 (FUISZ RICHARD C [US]) |