EP1570361 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING NETWORK PROCESSING FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NVIDIA Corporation 2701 San Tomas Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALFIERI, Robert, A. 104 Quarry Place Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | 02 /
HICOK, Gary, D. 1061 N. Omaha Circle Mesa, AZ 85025 / US | 03 /
SIDENBLAD, Paul, J. 10190 Stonydale Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
PARRIS, Mark, A. 1106 Exchange Place Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03813369.0 | 10.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003US39322 | Priority number, date | US20020319791 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: US 319791 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004055683 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1570361 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570361 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, H04L29/06 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/60 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0485 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L69/12 (EP,US);
H04L69/161 (EP,US);
H04L69/166 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L2212/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/164 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON NETZWERKVERARBEITUNGSFUNKTIONEN | [2005/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING NETWORK PROCESSING FUNCTIONS | [2005/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER LES FONCTIONS DE TRAITEMENT EN RESEAU | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07002456.7 / EP1791060 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5524250 (CHESSON GREG [US], et al) [A] 71-108 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 3, line 51 - line 65 * * column 7, line 1 - line 23 * * column 24, line 12 - line 19 * * column 36, line 30 - line 56 * * column 63, line 20 - line 31 * * column 86, line 49 - column 87, line 6 * * column 109, line 10 - line 16 *; | [Y]US6421730 (NARAD CHARLES E [US], et al) [Y] 71-108 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 44 * * column 10, line 30 - line 54 * * column 11, line 1 - line 8 *; | [X]WO02059757 (IREADY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-70 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 25 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 7 * * page 16, line 6 - page 27, line 7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A] - ITO M R ET AL, "A MULTIPROCESSOR APPROACH FOR MEETING THE PROCESSING REQUIREMENTS FOR OSI", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19930201), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 220 - 227, XP000377940 [A] 1-70 * abstract * * page 220, column R, paragraph L - page 222, column L, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.215017 | [Y] - OMONDI A R ET AL, "Performance of a context cache for a multithreaded pipeline", JOURNAL OF SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19981201), vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 1383-7621, pages 305 - 322, XP004142885 [Y] 71-108 * abstract * * page 306, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 307, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 308, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 311, column L - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1383-7621(97)00084-2 | [X] - SMITH, RICHARD E., Internet-Kryptographie, DEUTSCHE BIBLIOTHEK, ADDISON WESLEY LONGMAN, (1998), XP002295926 [X] 109-114 * page 107 - 109, chapters 4.3 and 4.31 * * page 146 - page 147; figure 5.7 * * page 293 - page 294; figure 11.9 * |