EP1575922 - BIPHENYL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department, Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department, Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRENFREUND, Josef Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 02 /
LAMBERTH, Clemens Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
TOBLER, Hans Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 04 /
WALTER, Harald Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Hölscher, Ingo, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Hölscher, Ingo, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/24] | Ward, Steven Paul, et al Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell RG42 6YA / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Bastian, Werner Maria Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03813891.3 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP14248 | Priority number, date | GB20020030155 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0230155 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058723 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575922 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575922 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/14, C07D231/16, C07D207/34, C07D277/56, C07D263/34, C07D333/38, C07D307/68, C07D309/28, C07D327/06, C07D213/82, C07D239/28, C07D239/30, C07D237/24, C07C233/03, C07C211/45 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/14 (EP,US);
A01N43/32 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/58 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/60 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/74 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
C07C211/45 (EP,US);
C07C211/52 (EP,US);
C07C217/76 (EP,US);
C07C219/32 (EP,US);
C07C233/03 (EP,US);
C07C25/24 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D231/16 (EP,US);
C07D237/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/28 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D309/28 (EP,US);
C07D327/06 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | 03.06.2005 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | 03.06.2005 | MK | 03.06.2005 | Title | German: | BIPHENYLDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS FUNGIZIDE | [2008/01] | English: | BIPHENYL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDES | [2005/38] | French: | DERIVES DE BIPHENYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE FONGICIDES | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/38] | BIPHENYLDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALSFUNGIZIDE | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | IE | 15.12.2008 | LU | 15.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
TR | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2205732 (THOMAE GMBH DR K) [X] 9,10 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US3928364 (SEEGER ERNST, et al) [X] 10 * example 10 *; | [A]US4016214 (DOUGLAS GEORGE HENRY, et al) [A] 10* example 4 *; | [X]US4036989 (ARMITAGE BERNARD J, et al) [X] 10 * examples 5-7,9-13 *; | [DX]JP2001302605 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [DX] 1-3,7,11,12 * examples 1-19,1-73,1-102,2-19,2-73,2-102 *; | [A]WO0208197 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PY]DE10204391 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PY] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PY]DE10204390 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PY] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PY]DE10215292 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PY] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PY]DE10218231 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [PY] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - D. C. NAAE ET. AL., "The solid-gas chlorination and bromination of a fluorinated olefin.", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1976), vol. 32, pages 2761 - 4, XP001181810 [X] 10 * page 2762, table * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)93832-2 | [X] - J. L. CHANAL ET. AL., "Comparison of the Metabolism and Pharmacokinetics of Metbufen and Itanoxone and their Analogues in Rats.", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG, (1988), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1454 - 60, XP000674615 [X] 10 * page 1456, compound Ia * | [X] - D. G. NAAE, "Reaction of Crystalline Fluoro Olefins with Bromine Vapour.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 42, no. 10, pages 1780 - 3, XP002230049 [X] 10 * page 1781, compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00430a023 | [X] - M. W. RENOLL, "Vinyl Aromatic Compounds. III. Fluorinated Derivatives.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1946), vol. 68, pages 1159 - 61, XP001181808 [X] 10 * page 1159, compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01211a008 | [X] - H. COUSSE ET. AL., "Synthèse, structure et activité hypocholerérolémiante d'une série d'acides gamma-aryl, gamma-oxo butyriques substitués et dérivés.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 22, pages 45 - 57, XP001181809 [X] 10 * tables VI,,VII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(87)90173-5 |