EP1574062 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HOME NETWORK CONTENT PROTECTION AND COPY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. 10202 W. Washington Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKAMP, Brian 18131 Kingsport Drive Malibu, CA 90265 / US | 02 /
SINGER, Mitch 6197 Temple Hill Drive Los Angeles, CA 90068 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03814131.3 | 16.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US40282 | Priority number, date | US20020434774P | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 434774 P | US20030403993 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: US 403993 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004059559 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574062 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574062 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04N21/4408 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/15] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIMNETZWERK INHALTSSCHUTZ UND KOPIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HOME NETWORK CONTENT PROTECTION AND COPY MANAGEMENT | [2005/37] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DE PROTECTION DE CONTENU DE RESEAU DOMESTIQUE ET DE GESTION DES COPIES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0062505 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 1, line 1 - page 15, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0146786 (LIQUID AUDIO INC [US]) [Y] 1-28 * page 6 - page 36 *; | [X]WO0175876 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 1, line 1 - page 13, line 13; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO0203211 (INTERNAP NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [Y] 1-28 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 16 *; | [Y]US2002026636 (LECOMTE DANIEL [FR]) [Y] 1-28* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0226] *; | [PX]WO03039155 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DVB-, "Call for proposals for content protection & copy management technologies", DVB CPT REV 1.2, www, (20010705), URL: http://www.cptwg.org/Assets/DVB-CPT-CfP_rev1.2.PDF, (20030210), XP002230687 [Y] 1-28 * page 1 - page 23 * | [Y] - IBM, "IBM RESPONSE TO DVB-CPT CALL FOR PROPOSALS FOR CONTENT PROTECTION & COPY MANAGEMENT:XCP CLUSTER PROTOCOL", INTERNET, www, (20011019), URL: HTTP://WWW.ALMADEN.IBM.COM/SOFTWARE/DS/CONTENTASSURANCE/PAPERS/XCP_DVB.P, XP001148193 [Y] 1-28 * page 3 - page 32 * |