EP1585511 - ASTHMA AND ALLERGIC INFLAMMATION MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2013/04] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states TULARIK, INC. 1120 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Zice 788 Santa Maria Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Xi, Alan 3061 La Selva, C-207 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 03 /
LIU, Jiwen 721 Celestial Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
MEDINA, Julio, C. 1407 Cedar Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 05 /
SCHMITT, Michael, J. 2137 Larkin Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 06 /
TANG, Lucy, H. 42 Levant Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 07 /
WANG, Yingcai 1824 El Parque Court, Apt. C San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 08 /
XU, Qingge 2001 Trousdale Drive Apt. 203 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2013/04] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
FU, Zice 788 Santa Maria Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
HUANG, Xi, Alan 3061 La Selva, C-207 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
03 /
LIU, Jiwen 721 Celestial Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
04 /
MEDINA, Julio, C. 1407 Cedar Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
05 /
SCHMITT, Michael, J. 2137 Larkin Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | |||
06 /
TANG, Lucy, H. 42 Levant Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | |||
07 /
WANG, Yingcai 1824 El Parque Court, Apt. C San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
08 /
XU, Qingge 2001 Trousdale Drive, Apt. 203 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | |||
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
FU, Zice 1050 Carolan Avenue, Apt. 202 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | ||
02 /
HUANG, Xi, Alan 3061 La Selva, C-207 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
03 /
LIU, Jiwen 721 Celestial Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
04 /
MEDINA, Julio, C. 1407 Cedar Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
05 /
SCHMITT, Michael, J. 2137 Larkin Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | |||
06 /
TANG, Lucy, H. 42 Levant Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | |||
07 /
WANG, Yingcai 1824 El Parque Court, Apt. C San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
08 /
XU, Qingge 2001 Trousdale Drive, Apt. 203 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03814219.6 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003US40617 | Priority number, date | US20020435366P | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 435366 P | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004058164 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1585511 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585511 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/18, C07C205/37, C07C233/75, C07C271/28, C07C275/42, C07C311/08, C07C311/21, C07D209/22, C07D213/71, C07D215/36, C07D233/84, C07D243/12, C07D333/34, C07D257/04, C07D307/91, C07D295/192, C07C317/44, A61P29/00, A61P37/08, A61P11/06 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
C07C205/37 (EP,US);
C07C311/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C205/56 (EP,US);
C07C233/75 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C275/42 (EP,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,US);
C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07D209/22 (EP,US);
C07D209/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,US);
C07D215/36 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D243/12 (EP,US);
C07D243/24 (EP,US);
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D307/91 (EP,US);
C07D333/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | A61K31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | MODULATOREN VON ASTHMA UND ALLERGISCHER ENTZÜNDUNG | [2005/42] | English: | ASTHMA AND ALLERGIC INFLAMMATION MODULATORS | [2005/42] | French: | MODULATEURS DE L'ASTHME ET DE L'INFLAMMATION ALLERGIQUE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 20.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2003 | AT | 23.01.2013 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 23.01.2013 | |
BG | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9533461 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 27 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0947500 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,23* example 18(39); claims 1,15 *; | [X] - MUNNS, M. J. ET AL, "Contribution of Type II PLA2 to prostaglandin formation: a study using a Type II PLA2 specific inhibitor SB 203347", PROSTAGLANDINS & OTHER LIPID MEDIATORS, 57(5,6), 361-370 CODEN: POLMFL; ISSN: 1098-8823, (1999), XP004179325 [X] 27 * page 362, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-6980(99)00012-X | International search | WO03016254 [ ] (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A] - TANI ET AL, "Preparation of aryl or heterocyclyl-substituted benzoic acid andand alkanoic acid derivatives as antagonists of prostaglandin E2 (PEG2) receptors", CA, Database accession no. 2003:154382, XP002992801 | Examination | - LIU JIWEN ET AL, "Discovery and optimization of CRTH2 and DP dual antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (200911), vol. 19, no. 22, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 6419 - 6423 | by applicant | WO9533461 | EP0947500 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), page 203 |