EP1573048 - BREAST SPECIFIC PROTEIN EXPRESSED IN CANCER AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avalon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 20358 Seneca Meadows Parkway Germantown, MD 20876 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIGLE, Bernd Sodener, Str.9 63454 Hanau / DE | 02 /
RIEGER, Michael Fiedlerstr.42 01307 Dresden / DE | 03 /
EBNER, Reinhard 9906 Shelburne Terrace 316 Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Williams, Gareth Owen, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Williams, Gareth Owen, et al Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Williams, Gareth Owen, et al Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road GB-Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03814242.8 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US40710 | Priority number, date | US20020434960P | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 434960 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004058167 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573048 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, G01N33/574 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/3015 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/5088 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07K1/00, C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEI KREBS EXPRIMIERTESBRUSTSPEZIFISCHES PROTEIN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2005/37] | English: | BREAST SPECIFIC PROTEIN EXPRESSED IN CANCER AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2005/37] | French: | PROTEINE SPECIFIQUE DU SEIN EXPRIMEE DANS LE CANCER, ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 17.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0208288 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); |